EP4280183 - VENDING MACHINE FOR DISPENSING PACKAGED PRODUCTS AND METHOD FOR DISPENSING A PACKAGED PRODUCT FROM A VENDING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.09.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.10.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Awayter, SL c/ Perot Rocaguinarda, 4 08500 Vic / ES | [2023/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SANS SERRA, Jordi 08503 Gurb / ES | 02 /
PRAT VILELLA, Joan 08508 Les Masies de Voltregà / ES | 03 /
BOVER CAPDEVILA, Eudald 08500 Vic / ES | [2023/47] | Representative(s) | Torner, Juncosa I Associats, SL C / Pau Claris, 108, 1r 1a 08009 Barcelona / ES | [2023/47] | Application number, filing date | 22382468.1 | 16.05.2022 | [2023/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4280183 | Date: | 22.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.02.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G07F11/00, G07F11/04, G07F11/10, G07F11/26 | [2023/47] | CPC: |
G07F11/005 (EP);
G07F11/04 (EP);
G07F11/10 (EP);
G07F11/26 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/47] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERKAUFSAUTOMAT ZUR AUSGABE VON VERPACKTEN PRODUKTEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR AUSGABE EINES VERPACKTEN PRODUKTS AUS EINEM VERKAUFSAUTOMAT | [2023/47] | English: | VENDING MACHINE FOR DISPENSING PACKAGED PRODUCTS AND METHOD FOR DISPENSING A PACKAGED PRODUCT FROM A VENDING MACHINE | [2023/47] | French: | DISTRIBUTEUR AUTOMATIQUE POUR LA DISTRIBUTION DE PRODUITS EMBALLÉS ET PROCÉDÉ DE DISTRIBUTION D'UN PRODUIT EMBALLÉ À PARTIR D'UN DISTRIBUTEUR AUTOMATIQUE | [2023/47] | Examination procedure | 23.05.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/42] | 13.06.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2024/42] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2024 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]GB2177075 (SANKEY VENDING LTD) [X] 1-3,11-13 * abstract * * page 1, line 81 - page 2, line 41 * [I] 4-6; | [I]US5285041 (WRIGHT CHRISTOPHER B [US]) [I] 1-6,11-13 * figures 1-6 * * column 2, line 63 - column 3, line 15 * * column 2, lines 39-41 * * column 5, line 27 - column 7, line 15 *; | [I]WO9739431 (BIFFARELLA GIUSEPPE [IT]) [I] 1-6,11-13 * abstract ** page 2, line 19 - page 7, line 14 * | by applicant | US3000538 | US3137410 | US3651752 | WO9428700 |