EP4279155 - DETACHABLE ASSEMBLY TO GIVE A DIRECTION TO A SKATEBOARD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.05.2024 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.10.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HLC SB Distribution, S.L. Polígono Lintzirin Gauna, Parcela E 20180 Oiartzun Guipuzcoa / ES | [2023/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Martínez Almansa, Juan José Oiartzun (GIPUZKOA) / ES | 02 /
Iraola Garmendia, Pedro Oiartzun (GIPUZKOA) / ES | [2023/47] | Representative(s) | Balder IP Law, S.L. Paseo de la Castellana 93 5ª planta 28046 Madrid / ES | [2023/47] | Application number, filing date | 22382481.4 | 18.05.2022 | [2023/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4279155 | Date: | 22.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A63C17/01, A63C17/00 | [2023/47] | CPC: |
A63C17/012 (EP,US);
A63C17/0033 (EP);
A63C17/015 (EP,US);
A63C17/017 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/26] |
Former [2023/47] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ABNEHMBARE EINHEIT, UM EINEM SKATEBOARD EINE RICHTUNG ZU GEBEN | [2023/47] | English: | DETACHABLE ASSEMBLY TO GIVE A DIRECTION TO A SKATEBOARD | [2023/47] | French: | ENSEMBLE DETACHABLE POUR DONNER UNE DIRECTION A UN SKATEBOARD | [2023/47] | Examination procedure | 21.05.2024 | Examination requested [2024/26] | 21.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.06.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4327204 (OYAIZU YOSHIJIRO, et al) [Y] 4 * column 2, line 33 - column 2, line 52 *; | [Y]US2002125670 (STRATTON NEIL [US]) [Y] 12 * paragraph [0028]; figure 1 *; | [Y]US2005012290 (MCCLAIN NATHAN MYLES [US]) [Y] 3 * paragraph [0042]; figure 3 *; | [Y]US2010301572 (NEWTON COLIN O [US]) [Y] 14 * paragraph [0047]; figure 9 *; | [X]US9199157 (YAMADA TSUTOMU [JP]) [X] 1,5-10,12,15* column 3, line 65 - column 6, line 55; figures 3,4,12 *; | [XAYI]EP3603759 (D&D BROADCAST INC [US]) [X] 1,2,5,8,10,13,15 * paragraphs [0057] - [0064]; figures 22a-c, 23a-f, 24 a-f, 25 a-f * [A] 6,7,9 [Y] 3,4,12,14 [I] 11 | by applicant | US6056302 | US6793224 |