EP4378887 - METHOD OF HYDROGENATION AND CALCINATION OF CACO3 WITH H2 [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 03.05.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Consejo Superior De Investigaciones Científicas C/ Serrano 117 28006 Madrid / ES | [2024/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ABANADES GARCIA, Juan Carlos Madrid / ES | 02 /
GRASA ADIEGO, Gemma Susana Madrid / ES | [2024/23] | Representative(s) | Pons Glorieta Rubén Darío 4 28010 Madrid / ES | [2024/23] | Application number, filing date | 22383163.7 | 01.12.2022 | [2024/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4378887 | Date: | 05.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C01B3/16, B01D53/62, B01D53/96, B01J23/72, B01J23/745, C01B3/18, C01F11/06, C01F11/18, C10K3/02, B01J8/08, B01J8/18, B01J8/24, B01J8/38 | [2024/23] | CPC: |
C01B3/16 (EP);
B01D53/62 (EP);
B01D53/83 (EP);
B01D53/96 (EP);
B01J8/08 (EP);
B01J8/1827 (EP);
B01J8/1863 (EP);
B01J8/24 (EP);
B01J8/38 (EP);
C01B3/18 (EP);
C01F11/06 (EP);
C01F11/18 (EP);
C10K3/026 (EP);
B01D2251/202 (EP);
B01D2251/404 (EP);
B01D2251/602 (EP);
B01D2257/504 (EP);
B01J23/72 (EP);
B01J23/745 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HYDRIERUNG UND KALZINIERUNG VON CACO3 MIT H2 | [2024/23] | English: | METHOD OF HYDROGENATION AND CALCINATION OF CACO3 WITH H2 | [2024/23] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'HYDROGÉNATION ET DE CALCINATION DE CACO3 AVEC H2 | [2024/23] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2017096335 (WORMSER ALEX [US]); | by applicant | US3558724 | US8318112 | US8506915 |