EP4098120 - AGRICULTURAL BOOM AND FIELD SPRAYER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2022/49] | AGRICULTURAL LINKAGE AND FIELD SPRAYER | ||
[2024/14] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.03.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.05.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 04.11.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Amazonen-Werke H. Dreyer SE & Co. KG Am Amazonenwerk 9-13 49205 Hasbergen / DE | [2022/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kowollik, Daniel 47443 Moers / DE | [2022/49] | Application number, filing date | 22401011.6 | 30.05.2022 | [2022/49] | Priority number, date | DE202110114405 | 03.06.2021 Original published format: DE102021114405 | [2022/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4098120 | Date: | 07.12.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4098120 | Date: | 19.06.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A01M7/00 | [2022/49] | CPC: |
A01M7/0075 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/23] |
Former [2022/49] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | GESTÄNGE EINES LANDWIRTSCHAFTLICHEN GERÄTS UND FELDSPRITZE | [2022/49] | English: | AGRICULTURAL BOOM AND FIELD SPRAYER | [2024/14] | French: | RAMPE D'UN APPAREIL AGRICOLE ET PULVÉRISATEUR | [2024/14] |
Former [2022/49] | AGRICULTURAL LINKAGE AND FIELD SPRAYER | ||
Former [2022/49] | TIGE D'UN APPAREIL AGRICOLE ET PULVÉRISATEUR | Examination procedure | 02.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/23] | 02.05.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.05.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 14.05.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE10013800 (HOLDER GMBH GEB [DE]); | [XA]DE102011002035 (AMAZONEN WERKE DREYER H [DE]); | [XY]EP3323288 (SAMSON AGRO AS [DK]); | [A]US2019104720 (SULLIVAN DENNIS J [US]); | [Y]US2020275645 (SMITH KEVIN M [US]); | by applicant | WO9952354 | DE102016114422 |