EP4311588 - FILTER VALVE ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 29.12.2023 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hamilton Sundstrand Corporation 2730 West Tyvola Road Four Coliseum Centre Charlotte, NC 28217 / US | [2024/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jedli ski, Marek Pawe 51-317 Wroclaw / PL | 02 /
Bujewicz, Maciej 51-317 Wroclaw / PL | [2024/05] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2024/05] | Application number, filing date | 22461584.9 | 28.07.2022 | [2024/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4311588 | Date: | 31.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B01D35/147, B01D35/153 | [2024/05] | CPC: |
B01D35/1475 (EP);
B01D35/1573 (US);
B01D35/153 (EP);
B01D2201/16 (US);
B01D2201/304 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/05] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FILTERVENTILANORDNUNG | [2024/05] | English: | FILTER VALVE ASSEMBLY | [2024/05] | French: | ENSEMBLE SOUPAPE DE FILTRE | [2024/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3235085 (HUMBERT JR KINGSLEY E) [A] 1-11 * column 5, lines 37-48; figures 3,4 *; | [Y]US3262563 (PALL DAVID B) [Y] 1,7-11 * column 7, line 64 - page 8, line 20 *; | [A]US4721563 (ROSAEN BORJE O [US]) [A] 1-11* column 3, line 23 - column 4, line 56 *; | [A]DE4328772 (DANA CORP [US]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2003127384 (KAPUR DESH [US]) [Y] 1,7-11 * paragraphs [0019] - [0026] *; | [A]US2008083664 (BONTAZ CHRISTOPHE [FR], et al) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0064] - [0076]; claim 1 * |