EP4281364 - TRANSPORT UNIT FOR AN AIRCRAFT, AND AIRCRAFT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.10.2023 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.07.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 02.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 24.04.2024 [2024/17] | 22.03.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 24.04.2024 [2024/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Germanium Skies GmbH Weißenberger Str. 1B 01324 Dresden / DE | [2023/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUFENBACH, Werner 01324 Dresden / DE | 02 /
WERNER, Jens 01640 Coswig / DE | [2023/48] | Representative(s) | Lippert Stachow Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Krenkelstraße 3 01309 Dresden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/48] | Häntzschel, Nadine Patentanwaltskanzlei Häntzschel Großenhainer Straße 157 01129 Dresden / DE | Application number, filing date | 22700535.2 | 12.01.2022 | [2023/48] | WO2022DE100020 | Priority number, date | DE202110101115 | 20.01.2021 Original published format: DE102021101115 | DE202110101116 | 20.01.2021 Original published format: DE102021101116 | [2023/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022156855 | Date: | 28.07.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4281364 | Date: | 29.11.2023 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.07.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B64C29/00 | [2023/48] | CPC: |
B64U10/13 (EP,US);
B64C27/22 (US);
B64C27/32 (US);
B64C29/0025 (US);
B64C3/38 (US);
B64D1/22 (US);
B64U30/12 (EP,US);
B64C17/04 (EP);
B64C27/20 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/48] | Title | German: | TRANSPORTEINHEIT FÜR EIN FLUGGERÄT UND FLUGGERÄT | [2023/48] | English: | TRANSPORT UNIT FOR AN AIRCRAFT, AND AIRCRAFT | [2023/48] | French: | UNITÉ DE TRANSPORT POUR UN AÉRONEF ET AÉRONEF | [2023/48] | Entry into regional phase | 15.08.2023 | National basic fee paid | 15.08.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.08.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.08.2023 | Examination requested [2023/48] | 15.08.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |