EP4288678 - ELECTROMOTIVE DRIVE FOR MOTOR VEHICLE APPLICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.11.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.08.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 02.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 08.05.2024 [2024/19] | 05.04.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 08.05.2024 [2024/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kiekert Aktiengesellschaft Höseler Platz 2 42579 Heiligenhaus / DE | [2023/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SZEGENY, Peter 51766 Engelskirchen / DE | 02 /
INAN, Ömer 46282 Dorsten / DE | 03 /
SCHIFFER, Holger 40668 Meerbusch / DE | 04 /
SCHOLZ, Michael 45136 Essen / DE | 05 /
REUSCH, Manuel 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [2023/50] | Representative(s) | Kiekert AG Patentabteilung Höseler Platz 2 42579 Heiligenhaus / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 22700537.8 | 13.01.2022 | [2023/50] | WO2022DE100022 | Priority number, date | DE202110102560 | 04.02.2021 Original published format: DE102021102560 | [2023/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022167028 | Date: | 11.08.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4288678 | Date: | 13.12.2023 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.08.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F16H21/40, E05B81/14, E05B81/30 | [2023/50] | CPC: |
F16H21/40 (EP);
E05B81/06 (EP);
E05B81/30 (EP);
E05B81/42 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/50] | Title | German: | ELEKTROMOTORISCHER ANTRIEB FÜR KRAFTFAHRZEUG-TECHNISCHE ANWENDUNGEN | [2023/50] | English: | ELECTROMOTIVE DRIVE FOR MOTOR VEHICLE APPLICATIONS | [2023/50] | French: | ENTRAÎNEMENT ÉLECTROMOTEUR POUR DES APPLICATIONS DE VÉHICULE MOTORISÉ | [2023/50] | Entry into regional phase | 17.08.2023 | National basic fee paid | 17.08.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.08.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.08.2023 | Examination requested [2023/50] | 17.08.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |