EP4272448 - MULTIPLE NEURAL NETWORK MODELS FOR FILTERING DURING VIDEO CODING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.10.2023 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.07.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 04.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM INCORPORATED ATTN: International IP Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2023/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Hongtao San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
KOTRA, Venkata Meher Satchit Anand San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 03 /
CHEN, Jianle San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 04 /
KARCZEWICZ, Marta San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2023/45] | Representative(s) | Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/45] | Howe, Steven Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | Application number, filing date | 22701075.8 | 03.01.2022 | [2023/45] | WO2022US11021 | Priority number, date | US202163133733P | 04.01.2021 Original published format: US 202163133733 P | US202117566282 | 30.12.2021 Original published format: US202117566282 | [2023/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022147494 | Date: | 07.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4272448 | Date: | 08.11.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.07.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/86, H04N19/117, H04N19/157, H04N19/176 | [2023/45] | CPC: |
H04N19/86 (EP,KR);
G06N3/045 (KR);
G06N3/0464 (KR);
H04N19/117 (EP,KR);
H04N19/157 (EP,KR);
H04N19/176 (EP,KR);
H04N19/82 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/45] | Title | German: | MEHRERE NEURONALE NETZWERKMODELLE ZUR FILTERUNG WÄHREND DER VIDEOCODIERUNG | [2023/45] | English: | MULTIPLE NEURAL NETWORK MODELS FOR FILTERING DURING VIDEO CODING | [2023/45] | French: | MULTIPLES MODÈLES À RÉSEAU DE NEURONES POUR FILTRAGE PENDANT UN CODAGE VIDÉO | [2023/45] | Entry into regional phase | 10.05.2023 | National basic fee paid | 10.05.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.05.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/45] | 10.05.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XYI] - KAWAMURA (KDDI) K ET AL, "CE13-related: Adaptive CNN based in-loop filtering with boundary weights", no. JVET-N0712, (20190320), 14. JVET MEETING; 20190319 - 20190327; GENEVA; (THE JOINT VIDEO EXPLORATION TEAM OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ),, URL: http://phenix.int-evry.fr/jvet/doc_end_user/documents/14_Geneva/wg11/JVET-N0712-v1.zip JVET-N0712.docx, (20190320), XP030204016 [X] 1,5,7,10,18-22,26,29-32 * abstract, section 2 * [Y] 1-32 [I] 2-4,6,9,11-13,23,24,27 | [Y] - JIA CHUANMIN ET AL, "Content-Aware Convolutional Neural Network for In-Loop Filtering in High Efficiency Video Coding", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON IMAGE PROCESSING, IEEE, USA, vol. 28, no. 7, doi:10.1109/TIP.2019.2896489, ISSN 1057-7149, (20190701), pages 3343 - 3356, (20190521), XP011725729 [Y] 1-32 * abstract, section IV;; figure 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TIP.2019.2896489 | [Y] - LI (BYTEDANCE) Y ET AL, "AHG11: Convolutional Neural Network-based In-Loop Filter with Adaptive Model Selection", no. JVET-U0068, (20201231), 21. JVET MEETING; 20210106 - 20210115; TELECONFERENCE; (THE JOINT VIDEO EXPLORATION TEAM OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ),, URL: https://jvet-experts.org/doc_end_user/documents/21_Teleconference/wg11/JVET-U0068-v1.zip JVET-U0068.docx, (20201231), XP030293144 [Y] 1-32 * section 2 * | [XP] - WANG (QUALCOMM) H ET AL, "AHG11: Neural Network-based In-Loop Filter Performance with No Deblocking Filtering stage", no. JVET-U0115, (20210105), 21. JVET MEETING; 20210106 - 20210115; TELECONFERENCE; (THE JOINT VIDEO EXPLORATION TEAM OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ),, URL: https://jvet-experts.org/doc_end_user/documents/21_Teleconference/wg11/JVET-U0115-v1.zip JVET-U0115-v1.docx, (20210105), XP030293264 [XP] 1-32 * the whole document * | by applicant | - BROSS et al., "Versatile Video Coding (Draft 9", Joint Video Experts Team (JVET) of ITU-T SG 16 WP 3 and ISO/IEC JTC 1/SC 29/WG 11, 18th Meeting:, 15-24 Apr., JVET-R2001-v8 |