EP4281371 - AIRCRAFT PROPULSION MODULE AND AIRCRAFT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.07.2024 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.10.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.07.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 07.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Blue Spirit Aero SAS 11 rue Amédée Bollée 92500 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | [2023/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VINCEKOVIC, David Woodville, SA 5011 / AU | 02 /
PASQUIET, Florian 30650 Rochefort du Gard / FR | 03 /
SAVIN, Olivier 92500 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | [2023/48] | Representative(s) | Schulze, Mark Von Lieres Brachmann Schulze Patentanwälte in Partnerschaft Dietramszeller Str. 22 83624 Otterfing / DE | [2023/48] | Application number, filing date | 22701245.7 | 20.01.2022 | [2023/48] | WO2022EP51236 | Priority number, date | EP20210153046 | 22.01.2021 Original published format: EP 21153046 | EP20210186951 | 21.07.2021 Original published format: EP 21186951 | [2023/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022157245 | Date: | 28.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4281371 | Date: | 29.11.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.07.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B64D27/30, B64D27/355, B64D37/30, B60L50/70, B64D3/00, B64D1/10, B64D1/12, H01M8/00, B60L58/40, B60L50/71, B64D37/04, B60L50/75 | [2024/31] | CPC: |
B60L50/71 (EP);
B60L50/75 (EP);
B60L58/40 (EP);
B64D1/10 (EP);
B64D1/12 (EP);
B64D27/30 (EP);
B64D27/355 (EP);
B64D3/00 (EP);
B64D37/04 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2023/48] | B64D27/24, B64D37/30, B64C23/06, B60L50/70, B64D3/00, B64D1/10, B64D1/12, H01M8/00, B60L58/40, B64D41/00, B60L50/71, B64C1/06, B64C3/56 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/48] | Title | German: | FLUGZEUGANTRIEBSMODUL UND FLUGZEUG | [2023/48] | English: | AIRCRAFT PROPULSION MODULE AND AIRCRAFT | [2023/48] | French: | MODULE DE PROPULSION D'AÉRONEF ET AÉRONEF | [2023/48] | Entry into regional phase | 17.08.2023 | National basic fee paid | 17.08.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.08.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.08.2023 | Examination requested [2023/48] | 17.08.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.07.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2008261084 (DINEEN THOMAS D [US]); | [Y]DE202016006522U (SIMON ASKAN [DE]); | [Y]WO2019241581 (BOSMA MARINUS BERNARD [US], et al); | [XDAY]WO2020003181 (H3 DYNAMICS HOLDINGS PTE LTD [SG]); | [XY]WO2020060488 (H3 DYNAMICS HOLDINGS PTE LTD [SG]); | [A]FR3097201 (AIRBUS [FR], et al) | by applicant | WO2020003181 |