EP4284791 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCTION OF INTERMEDIATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.11.2023 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.08.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Change - applicant | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DSM IP Assets B.V. Wilhelminasingel 39 6221 BE Maastricht / NL | [2024/40] |
Former [2023/49] | For all designated states DSM IP Assets B.V. Het Overloon 1 6411 TE Heerlen / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BONRATH, Werner 4303 Kaiseraugst / CH | 02 /
MEDLOCK, Jonathan, Alan 4303 Kaiseraugst / CH | 03 /
MUELLER, Marc-André 4303 Kaiseraugst / CH | 04 /
WUESTENBERG, Bettina 4303 Kaiseraugst / CH | [2023/49] | Representative(s) | dsm-firmenich IP Wurmisweg 576 4303 Kaiseraugst / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2023/49] | Kurt, Manfred DSM NUTRITIONAL PRODUCTS LTD. Patent Department Wurmisweg 576 4303 Kaiseraugst / CH | Application number, filing date | 22701343.0 | 14.01.2022 | [2023/49] | WO2022EP50708 | Priority number, date | EP20210154605 | 01.02.2021 Original published format: EP 21154605 | [2023/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022161789 | Date: | 04.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4284791 | Date: | 06.12.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.08.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C07D333/48 | [2023/49] | CPC: |
C07D333/48 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/49] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON ZWISCHENPRODUKTEN | [2023/49] | English: | PROCESS FOR PRODUCTION OF INTERMEDIATES | [2023/49] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'INTERMÉDIAIRES | [2023/49] | Entry into regional phase | 30.06.2023 | National basic fee paid | 30.06.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.06.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/49] | 30.06.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I] - FRANK KIENZLE ET AL, "Selektive Funktionalisierung von Polyenen", HELVETICA CHIMICA ACTA, (19750101), vol. 58, no. 1, doi:10.1002/hlca.19750580105, ISSN 0018-019X, pages 27 - 40, XP055702824 [I] 1-12 * page 36; compounds 21-23 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/hlca.19750580105 | [XI] - "1,4-Cycloaddition Reactions - The Diels-Alder Reaction in Heterocyclic Syntheses", vol. 8, doi:10.1016/B978-0-12-395743-6.50007-7, ISSN 0078-611X, ISBN 978-0-12-395743-6, (19670101), pages 13 - 45, Elsevier, URL: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/B978-0-12-395743-6.50007-7, XP055804354 [X] 1-3,6-8 * table 1 * [I] 4,5,9-12 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/B978-0-12-395743-6.50007-7 | [XI] - KOTHA SAMBASIVARAO ET AL, "Diversity Oriented Approach to Phenylalanine Derivatives via the Diels-Alder Reaction Involving Sulfolene Intermediates", JP, vol. 90, no. 1, doi:10.3987/COM-14-S(K)9, ISSN 0385-5414, (20150101), page 226, HETEROCYCLES, URL: http://dx.doi.org/10.3987/COM-14-S(K)9, XP055804379 [X] 1-3,6,7,10 * scheme 3;; compounds 8, 9 * [I] 4,5,8,9,11,12 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3987/COM-14-S(K)9 | [I] - ROTH WOLFGANG R. ET AL, "Zur Energiedelle von Diradikalen, IV[1]. 2-Methylen-1,4-cyclohexadiyl", DE, vol. 126, no. 12, doi:10.1002/cber.19931261221, ISSN 0009-2940, (19931201), pages 2701 - 2715, CHEMISCHE BERICHTE, URL: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/cber.19931261221, XP055804403 [I] 1-12 * scheme on page 2702, right-hand column and excperimental part on page 2714;; compounds 15, 16 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/cber.19931261221 | [X] - T. SUBRAMANIAN ET AL, "Convenient Synthesis of 1,3,6-Triene Systems Through Alkylation of 3-Methyl-3-sulfolene.", SYNTHETIC COMMUNICATIONS, US, (19971222), vol. 27, no. 23, doi:10.1080/00397919708005452, ISSN 0039-7911, pages 4067 - 4072, XP055725874 [X] 12 * example 8 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/00397919708005452 | [A] - DESAI SHAILESH R ET AL, "Studies in alkylation of 3-methyl-3-sulfolene and thermolysis of resulting 2-alkyl-3-sulfolenes: Convenient synthesis of 1,2-disubstituted-1,3-dienes", TETRAHEDRON, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19920101), vol. 48, no. 3, doi:10.1016/S0040-4020(01)89010-4, ISSN 0040-4020, pages 481 - 490, XP055804845 [A] 1-12 * compound 3e * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4020(01)89010-4 | [A] - Chou Ta-Shue ET AL, "Stereoselective One-step Syntheses of trans-P-Ocimene and a-Farnesene", J . CHEM. SOC., CHEM. COMMUN, (19840101), URL: https://pubs.rsc.org/en/content/articlepdf/1984/c3/c39840001323, (20210517), XP055804857 [A] 1-12 * compound 8c * | [A] - CHAPUIS CHRISTIAN ET AL, "A Concise Synthesis of rac - Ambrox via the Palladium(0)-Catalyzed Carboalkoxylation of an Allylic Ammonium Salt, as Compared to a Formaldehyde Hetero Diels-Alder Approach", HELVETICA CHIMICA ACTA, (20190726), vol. 102, no. 7, doi:10.1002/hlca.201900097, ISSN 0018-019X, XP055805131 [A] 1-12 * compound 27 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/hlca.201900097 | by applicant | - Z. WU et al., J. Am. Chem. Soc., (20050000), page 17433 |