EP4284786 - DIAMINOTRIAZINE COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.11.2023 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.08.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 09.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] | 29.03.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [2023/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GEERDINK, Danny 7102 ES Winterswijk / NL | 02 /
WITSCHEL, Matthias 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | 03 /
LOPEZ CARRILLO, Veronica 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | 04 /
NEWTON, Trevor William 67117 Limburgerhof / DE | 05 /
ZIERKE, Thomas 67459 Boehl-Iggelheim / DE | 06 /
RACK, Michael 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | 07 /
PETKOVA, Desislava Slavcheva 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | 08 /
HARTMUELLER, Martin 67117 Limburgerhof / DE | 09 /
LANGE, Sandra 67117 Limburgerhof / DE | 10 /
SEITZ, Thomas 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2023/49] | Representative(s) | BASF IP Association BASF SE GBI-C006 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/49] | BASF IP Association BASF SE GBI-C006 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Application number, filing date | 22701564.1 | 17.01.2022 | [2023/49] | WO2022EP50852 | Priority number, date | EP20210153660 | 27.01.2021 Original published format: EP 21153660 | [2023/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022161802 | Date: | 04.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4284786 | Date: | 06.12.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.08.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C07D251/18, A01N43/68, A01P13/00 | [2023/49] | CPC: |
C07D251/18 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A01N43/68 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A01P13/00 (KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/49] | Title | German: | DIAMINOTRIAZINVERBINDUNGEN | [2023/49] | English: | DIAMINOTRIAZINE COMPOUNDS | [2023/49] | French: | COMPOSÉS DE DIAMINOTRIAZINE | [2023/49] | Entry into regional phase | 28.08.2023 | National basic fee paid | 28.08.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.08.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.08.2023 | Examination requested [2023/49] | 28.08.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2015155271 (BASF SE [DE]); | [YD]WO2015155272 (BASF SE [DE]); | [YD]WO2015162166 (BASF SE [DE]); | [Y]WO2020058009 (BASF SE [DE]) | by applicant | EP0374753 | EP0392225 | EP0427529 | EP0451878 | WO9307278 | WO9534656 | WO02078701 | WO03018810 | WO03052073 | WO2006024820 | WO2006037945 | WO2007067612 | WO2007071900 | WO2007096576 | WO2015155272 | WO2015162166 |