EP4278790 - RESOURCE SELECTION IN AN ANCHOR-CLIENT NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.10.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.07.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 09.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] | 15.03.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2023/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RYU, Jung Ho San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
AKKARAKARAN, Sony San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 03 /
LI, Junyi San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 04 /
LUO, Tao San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 05 /
ZHANG, Xiaoxia San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 06 /
GAAL, Peter San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 07 /
MONTOJO, Juan San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 08 /
CHENDAMARAI KANNAN, Arumugam San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 09 /
DAMNJANOVIC, Jelena San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 10 /
WANG, Xiaojie San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 11 /
SUN, Jing San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 12 /
GUPTA, Piyush San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 13 /
OZTURK, Ozcan San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 14 /
MARSH, Gene Wesley San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2023/47] | Representative(s) | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [2023/47] | Application number, filing date | 22701870.2 | 11.01.2022 | [2023/47] | WO2022US70134 | Priority number, date | US202117148213 | 13.01.2021 Original published format: US202117148213 | [2023/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022155638 | Date: | 21.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4278790 | Date: | 22.11.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.07.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/04 | [2023/47] | CPC: |
H04W72/046 (EP);
H04W72/20 (US);
H04W76/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/47] | Title | German: | RESSOURCENAUSWAHL IN EINEM ANKER-CLIENT-NETZWERK | [2023/47] | English: | RESOURCE SELECTION IN AN ANCHOR-CLIENT NETWORK | [2023/47] | French: | SÉLECTION DE RESSOURCES DANS UN RÉSEAU D'ANCRAGE-CLIENT | [2023/47] | Entry into regional phase | 18.05.2023 | National basic fee paid | 18.05.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.05.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/47] | 18.05.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]US2015249979 (KIM JOON BEOM [US], et al) [X] 23-30 * abstract * * paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0048] * [A] 1-22; | [A]WO2020030162 (ZTE CORP [CN]) [A] 1-30 * abstract ** paragraph [0159] - paragraph [0160] * |