EP4284219 - BEVERAGE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.11.2023 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.08.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 11.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 08.05.2024 [2024/19] | 05.04.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 08.05.2024 [2024/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Société des Produits Nestlé S.A. Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | [2024/18] |
Former [2023/49] | For all designated states Société des Produits Nestlé S.A. Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MURPHY, Audrey, Virginie 1304 Cossonay / CH | 02 /
DOGAN, Nihan 1090 La Croix-sur-Lutry / CH | 03 /
BONIN, Marilyne Isabelle 25160 Les Grangettes / FR | [2023/49] | Representative(s) | Ducreux, Marie Société des Produits Nestlé S.A. Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | [2023/49] | Application number, filing date | 22701967.6 | 26.01.2022 | [2023/49] | WO2022EP51697 | Priority number, date | EP20210154182 | 29.01.2021 Original published format: EP 21154182 | [2023/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022161983 | Date: | 04.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4284219 | Date: | 06.12.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.08.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A47J31/06, A47J31/40, A47J31/36 | [2023/49] | CPC: |
A47J31/0673 (EP,KR,US);
A47J31/0678 (EP,KR);
A47J31/369 (EP,KR,US);
A47J31/407 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/49] | Title | German: | GETRÄNKESYSTEM | [2023/49] | English: | BEVERAGE SYSTEM | [2023/49] | French: | SYSTÈME DE BOISSON | [2023/49] | Entry into regional phase | 29.08.2023 | National basic fee paid | 29.08.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.08.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.08.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.08.2023 | Examination requested [2023/49] | 29.08.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]CH697407 (DELICA AG [CH]); | [A]EP2409609 (NESTEC SA [CH]); | [A]US2012090473 (DEUBER LOUIS [CH]); | [A]US9125515 (AARDENBURG CORNELIS [CH]) | by applicant | EP1472156 | EP2131704 |