EP4285159 - DEVICE FOR DETERMINING THE ATTITUDE OF A CARRIER, AND ASSOCIATED SYSTEM FOR ASSISTING WITH THE PILOTING OF A CARRIER AND DETERMINATION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.11.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.08.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 11.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 08.05.2024 [2024/19] | 05.04.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 08.05.2024 [2024/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THALES Tour Carpe Diem Place des Corolles Esplanade Nord 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [2023/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEPRAZ, David 26000 VALENCE / FR | 02 /
MEHLEN, Christian 26000 VALENCE / FR | [2023/49] | Representative(s) | Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [2023/49] | Application number, filing date | 22702271.2 | 28.01.2022 | [2023/49] | WO2022EP52005 | Priority number, date | FR20210000864 | 29.01.2021 Original published format: FR 2100864 | [2023/49] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022162123 | Date: | 04.08.2022 | Language: | FR | [2022/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4285159 | Date: | 06.12.2023 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.08.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01S19/53, G01C21/00 | [2023/49] | CPC: |
G01S19/53 (EP);
G01S19/55 (US);
G01S19/36 (EP,US);
G01C21/005 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/49] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR BESTIMMUNG DER LAGE EINES TRÄGERS UND ZUGEHÖRIGES SYSTEM ZUR UNTERSTÜTZUNG DER FÜHRUNG EINES TRÄGERS UND BESTIMMUNGSVERFAHREN | [2023/49] | English: | DEVICE FOR DETERMINING THE ATTITUDE OF A CARRIER, AND ASSOCIATED SYSTEM FOR ASSISTING WITH THE PILOTING OF A CARRIER AND DETERMINATION METHOD | [2023/49] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DÉTERMINATION DE L'ATTITUDE D'UN PORTEUR, ET SYSTÈME D'AIDE AU PILOTAGE D'UN PORTEUR ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTERMINATION ASSOCIÉS | [2023/49] | Entry into regional phase | 27.07.2023 | National basic fee paid | 27.07.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.07.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/49] | 27.07.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9628747 (INTERVAL RESEARCH CORP [US]) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * figures 1-9b * * page 1, line 5 - page 4, line 9 * * page 13, line 28 - page 16, line 25 *; | [A]EP1775599 (LOCATA CORP [US]) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * figures 1-10 * * paragraphs [0001] - [0022] - [0024] - [0025] - [0028] , [0034] - [0037] * * claims 1-28 *; | [I]EP2674783 (THALES SA [FR]) [I] 1-13 * abstract * * figures 1-7 * * paragraphs [0001] , [0008] , [0012] , [0013] , [0016] , [0021] , [0023] , [0028] - [0032] - [0050] , [0069] , [0076] * * claims 1-6 *; | [A]EP2758805 (NOVATEL INC [CA]) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * figures 1-4 * * paragraphs [0001] - [0014] - [0 26] - [0029] * * claims 1-22 *; | [A] - BELOKONOV I V ET AL, "Estimation of the nanosatellite attitude and angular rate by analyzing the navigation spacecraft geometrical visibility using the controllable pattern of navigation antenna", 2017 24TH SAINT PETERSBURG INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON INTEGRATED NAVIGATION SYSTEMS (ICINS), CONCERN CSRI ELEKTROPRIBOR, JSC, (20170529), doi:10.23919/ICINS.2017.7995676, pages 1 - 4, XP033133487 [A] 1-13 * abstract * * I. Introduction * * II. Mathematical statement of problem of the nanosatellite monoaxial attitude determination * * III. Algorithm of the nanosatellite monoaxial attitude determination according to the analysis of the NS geometrical visibility * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.23919/ICINS.2017.7995676 |