EP4284862 - PREPARATION FOR A MOLDED BODY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.11.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.08.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 15.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 08.05.2024 [2024/19] | 05.04.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 08.05.2024 [2024/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [2023/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHMIDT, Lisa Marie 49448 Lemfoerde / DE | 02 /
POESELT, Elmar 49448 Lemfoerde / DE | 03 /
HUELSMANN, Theresa 49448 Lemfoerde / DE | 04 /
RAPP, Florian Tobias 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | 05 /
HAASE, Eva Anna 49448 Lemfoerde / DE | 06 /
GUTMANN, Peter 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | 07 /
THIELBEER, Frank 49448 Lemfoerde / DE | [2023/49] | Representative(s) | BASF IP Association BASF SE GBI-C006 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/49] | BASF IP Association BASF SE GBI-C006 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Application number, filing date | 22702662.2 | 26.01.2022 | [2023/49] | WO2022EP51740 | Priority number, date | EP20210154299 | 29.01.2021 Original published format: EP 21154299 | [2023/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022161994 | Date: | 04.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4284862 | Date: | 06.12.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.08.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C08J9/14, C08J9/18, C08G18/32 | [2023/49] | CPC: |
C08J9/141 (EP,US);
C08J9/228 (US);
C08G18/161 (EP);
C08G18/168 (EP);
C08G18/244 (EP,US);
C08G18/3206 (EP);
C08G18/3215 (EP);
C08G18/4808 (EP);
C08G18/4854 (EP);
C08G18/4858 (US);
C08G18/4887 (EP);
C08G18/631 (US);
C08G18/6674 (EP);
C08G18/73 (EP,US);
C08G18/7671 (EP,US);
C08J9/18 (EP,US);
C08J9/232 (EP);
C08G2101/00 (EP);
C08J2203/14 (EP);
C08J2300/22 (EP);
C08J2300/26 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/49] | Title | German: | ZUBEREITUNG FÜR EINEN FORMKÖRPER | [2023/49] | English: | PREPARATION FOR A MOLDED BODY | [2023/49] | French: | PRÉPARATION POUR CORPS MOULÉ | [2023/49] | Entry into regional phase | 29.08.2023 | National basic fee paid | 29.08.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.08.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.11.2022 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.08.2023 | Examination requested [2023/49] | 29.08.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YD]WO2007082838 (BASF AG [DE], et al) [YD] 17 * example 1 *; | [YD]WO2019185687 (BASF SE [DE]) [YD] 19,20* claim 1 *; | [XYI]US2020362086 (POPPENBERG JOHANNES [US], et al) [X] 5-15 * example -; table 2a * [Y] 17,19,20 [I] 1-18,22-24 | by applicant | WO9420568 | WO2007082838 | EP1979401 | WO2010010010 | WO2013153190 | WO2014150122 | EP2872309 | US2015337102 | EP3053732 | WO2016146537 | WO2017030835 | WO2019185687 | EP3700969 | - Ullmann's ''Encyclopedia of Technical Chemistry, Hanser Publishers, (20010000), vol. 20, pages 416 - 136 | - Polymer Chemistry, Interscience Publ., (19610000), pages 111 - 127 | - Kunststoff Handbuch, C. Hanser Verlag, (19730000), vol. VIII | - Journal of Polymer Science, (19660000), vol. 4, pages 1851 - 1859 | - "Polyurethanes", Plastic Manual, (19930000), vol. 7 | WO2017EP79049 |