EP4291453 - METHOD AND BRAKE SYSTEM FOR THE EMERGENCY STOPPING OF A COMMERCIAL VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.11.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.08.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 16.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | 19.04.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZF CV Systems Global GmbH Giacomettistrasse 1 3006 Bern / CH | [2023/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN THIEL, Julian 30938 Grossburgwedel / DE | [2023/51] | Representative(s) | Rabe, Dirk-Heinrich ZF CV Systems Hannover GmbH Am Lindener Hafen 21 30453 Hannover / DE | [2023/51] | Application number, filing date | 22702960.0 | 01.02.2022 | [2023/51] | WO2022EP52261 | Priority number, date | DE202110103478 | 15.02.2021 Original published format: DE102021103478 | [2023/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022171480 | Date: | 18.08.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4291453 | Date: | 20.12.2023 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.08.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B60T17/08, B60T7/22, B60T8/17, B60T8/32, B60W60/00 | [2023/51] | CPC: |
B60T17/086 (EP);
B60T7/12 (US);
B60T13/385 (US);
B60T13/683 (US);
B60T7/16 (US);
B60T7/22 (EP);
B60T8/1708 (EP);
B60T8/17616 (US);
B60T8/321 (US);
B60T8/327 (EP);
B60T8/94 (US);
B60W10/182 (EP);
B60W10/184 (EP);
B60W60/007 (EP);
B60T2210/12 (US);
B60T2240/00 (US);
B60T2250/02 (US);
B60T2250/04 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/51] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND BREMSSYSTEM ZUM NOTSTOPPEN EINES NUTZFAHRZEUGS | [2023/51] | English: | METHOD AND BRAKE SYSTEM FOR THE EMERGENCY STOPPING OF A COMMERCIAL VEHICLE | [2023/51] | French: | SYSTÈME DE FREIN ET PROCÉDÉ D'ARRÊT D'URGENCE D'UN VÉHICULE UTILITAIRE | [2023/51] | Entry into regional phase | 29.06.2023 | National basic fee paid | 29.06.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.06.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/51] | 29.06.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAYI]EP3031681 (MAN TRUCK & BUS AG [DE]) [X] 1,8,12,21,25 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0037]; figure 2; claims 1-9 * [A] 10,11,23,24 [Y] 2-7,9,13-18,22 [I] 19,20; | [YA]US2019118786 (WULF OLIVER [DE]) [Y] 2-7,9,13-18,22 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0060]; claims 1-20 * * paragraph [0095] - paragraph [0099]; figure 3 * [A] 1,10-12,23,24; | [A]US2019248349 (WULF OLIVER [DE]) [A] 1,12* the whole document * | by applicant | DE102014013756 | DE102016005318 | DE102016010462 | DE102016010464 | DE102016010463 | DE102016010461 | DE102017001409 | DE102017002716 | DE102017002718 | DE102017002719 | DE102017002721 |