EP4278288 - WORKLOAD CONFIGURATION EXTRACTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.10.2023 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.07.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 07.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 24.04.2024 [2024/17] | 22.03.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 24.04.2024 [2024/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Virsec Systems, Inc. 226 Airport Parkway, Suite 350 San Jose CA 95110 / US | [2023/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUPTA, Satya, V. San Jose, CA 95110 / US | 02 /
VARSHNEY, Subhash, C. San Jose, CA 95110 / US | 03 /
GUPTA, Piyush Bengaluru, Karnataka 560102 / IN | 04 /
DIXIT, Vishal Bengaluru, Karnataka 560102 / IN | 05 /
NAG, Avishek Bengaluru, Karnataka 560102 / IN | 06 /
AHUJA, Rohan Bengaluru, Karnataka 560102 / IN | [2023/47] | Representative(s) | Cobbold, Alistair John, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [2023/47] | Application number, filing date | 22706212.2 | 18.01.2022 | [2023/47] | WO2022US70240 | Priority number, date | IN202141002208 | 18.01.2021 Original published format: IN202141002208 | US202163155466P | 02.03.2021 Original published format: US 202163155466 P | US202117460004 | 27.08.2021 Original published format: US202117460004 | WO2021US48077 | 27.08.2021 Original published format: PCT/US2021/048077 | WO2021US73201 | 30.12.2021 Original published format: PCT/US2021/073201 | US202117646622 | 30.12.2021 Original published format: US202117646622 | [2023/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022155687 | Date: | 21.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4278288 | Date: | 22.11.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.07.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/57, G06F11/22, G06F8/71, G06F21/54, G06F21/53 | [2023/47] | CPC: |
G06F8/36 (EP);
G06F21/577 (EP);
G06F9/44505 (EP);
G06F21/53 (EP);
G06F21/54 (EP);
G06N20/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/47] | Title | German: | ARBEITSLASTKONFIGURATIONSEXTRAKTOR | [2023/47] | English: | WORKLOAD CONFIGURATION EXTRACTOR | [2023/47] | French: | EXTRACTEUR DE CONFIGURATION DE CHARGE DE TRAVAIL | [2023/47] | Entry into regional phase | 28.07.2023 | National basic fee paid | 28.07.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.07.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/47] | 28.07.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2024 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   26.02.2024 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2016164891 (SATISH SOURABH [US], et al) [A] 8-11 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0023] * * figure 2 *; | [XYI] - CHEN HAO ET AL, "Detecting and identifying system changes in the cloud via discovery by example", 2014 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON BIG DATA (BIG DATA), IEEE, (20141027), doi:10.1109/BIGDATA.2014.7004217, pages 90 - 99, XP032717410 [X] 1,2,4,6,7,19,20 * Sections III-VI * * pages 2, 6 * [Y] 15 [I] 3,5,8-14,16-18 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/BigData.2014.7004217 | [Y] - VASSILIS PREVELAKIS VP@PREVELAKIS NET DEPARTMENT OF COMPUTER AND INFORMATION SCIENCE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA DIOMIDIS SPINELLIS, "Sandboxing Applications", (20190225), pages 1 - 9, USENIX, USENIX, THE ADVANCED COMPUTING SYSTEMS ASSOCIATION, URL: http://www.usenix.org/publications/library/proceedings/usenix01/freenix01/full_papers/prevelakis/prevelakis.pdf, (20190225), XP061065771 [Y] 15 * abstract * * Section 3 * | [A] - CHEN H. ET AL, "Automated system change discovery and management in the cloud", IBM JOURNAL OF RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT., US, vol. 60, no. 2-3, doi:10.1147/JRD.2015.2511811, ISSN 0018-8646, (20160301), pages 2:1 - 2:10, URL: https://www.bu.edu/peaclab/files/2016/07/HChen_IBMJournal16_ChangeDiscovery.pdf, XP055905954 [A] 1-20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1147/JRD.2015.2511811 | by applicant | WO2021US48077 | WO2021US73201 |