EP4314722 - THERMAL SENSOR AND METHOD FOR OPERATING THE THERMAL SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.09.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 11.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | 24.05.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Innovative Sensor Technology IST AG Stegrütistrasse 14 9642 Ebnat-Kappel / CH | [2024/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERNHARDSGRÜTTER, Ralf Emanuel 8583 Sulgen / CH | 02 /
HEPP, Christoph 9500 Wil / CH | [2024/06] | Representative(s) | Trenkle, Dennis Endress + Hauser Group Services (Deutschland) AG+Co. KG Colmarer Straße 6 79576 Weil am Rhein / DE | [2024/06] | Application number, filing date | 22706848.3 | 21.02.2022 | [2024/06] | WO2022EP54256 | Priority number, date | DE202110107080 | 22.03.2021 Original published format: DE102021107080 | [2024/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022199960 | Date: | 29.09.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4314722 | Date: | 07.02.2024 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.09.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01F1/68, G01F1/7084, G01F25/10, G01F15/02, G01F1/696, G01K3/10, G01K13/02, G01N25/20 | [2024/06] | CPC: |
G01F1/68 (EP);
G01F1/696 (US);
G01F1/6965 (EP);
G01F1/7084 (EP);
G01F15/02 (EP);
G01F25/10 (EP);
G01K13/02 (EP);
G01K3/08 (EP);
G01K7/18 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/06] | Title | German: | THERMISCHER SENSOR UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN DESSELBEN | [2024/06] | English: | THERMAL SENSOR AND METHOD FOR OPERATING THE THERMAL SENSOR | [2024/06] | French: | CAPTEUR THERMIQUE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT | [2024/06] | Entry into regional phase | 21.08.2023 | National basic fee paid | 21.08.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.08.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.08.2023 | Examination requested [2024/06] | 21.08.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2009000396 (KAWANISHI TOSHIAKI [JP], et al); | [A]DE102011075519 (INNOVATIVE SENSOR TECHNOLOGY IST AG [CH]); | [A]US2016245681 (MAGINNIS THOMAS O [US], et al); | [A]US2016290849 (BADARLIS ANASTASIOS [CH], et al); | [A]DE102015115761 (ENDRESS & HAUSER FLOWTEC AG [CH]); | [XAI]WO2020009921 (BECTON DICKINSON CO [US]); | by applicant | DE102018130548 |