EP4291557 - COMPOUNDS AND THEIR USE AS PDE4 ACTIVATORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.11.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.08.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 11.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | 19.04.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mironid Limited Arbuthnott Building - Hamnett Wing 161 Cathedral Street Glasgow G4 0RE / GB | [2023/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ADAM, Julia Mary Glasgow G4 0RE / GB | 02 /
ADAMS, David Roger Glasgow G4 0RE / GB | [2023/51] | Representative(s) | Heller, Benjamin Henry, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [2023/51] | Application number, filing date | 22706880.6 | 15.02.2022 | [2023/51] | WO2022GB50402 | Priority number, date | GB20210002088 | 15.02.2021 Original published format: GB 202102088 | [2023/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022172037 | Date: | 18.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4291557 | Date: | 20.12.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.08.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C07D417/04, C07D417/10, C07D471/04, C07D471/10, C07D487/04, C07D487/08, C07D487/10, C07D491/08, A61P29/00, A61P35/00, A61P37/00, A61P43/00, A61K31/4436, A61K31/4535, A61K31/496 | [2023/51] | CPC: |
C07D417/04 (EP,US);
A61P13/12 (US);
C07D277/82 (US);
C07D417/14 (EP,US);
C07D471/04 (EP,US);
C07D471/10 (EP);
C07D471/18 (US);
C07D471/20 (US);
C07D487/04 (EP);
C07D487/08 (EP);
C07D487/10 (EP);
C07D491/08 (EP);
C07D498/10 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/51] | Title | German: | VERBINDUNGEN UND IHRE VERWENDUNG ALS PDE4-AKTIVATOREN | [2023/51] | English: | COMPOUNDS AND THEIR USE AS PDE4 ACTIVATORS | [2023/51] | French: | COMPOSÉS ET LEUR UTILISATION EN TANT QU'ACTIVATEURS DE PDE4 | [2023/51] | Entry into regional phase | 30.08.2023 | National basic fee paid | 30.08.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.08.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.08.2023 | Examination requested [2023/51] | 30.08.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2006207785 (ACTELOIN PHARMACEUTICALS LTD.) [A] 1-51 * example 75; claim - *; | [A]US2009130076 (SINGH JASBIR [US], et al) [A] 1-51* paragraph [[0003]]; example -; claim - *; | [X]WO2015038503 (DU PONT [US]) [X] 15,16,20,23,24,26,33,35-37,39 * page 106, Table 17a and pages 50-55,Table 1a; page 167 Index Table E, compounds 88 and 126 *; | [A]EP3020718 (MEIJI SEIKA PHARMA CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-51 * examples 96-101; claim - *; | [A]WO2020004521 (MEIJI SEIKA PHARMA CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-51 * page 1; examples 94. 98-101, 353-358, 385-390; claim - * | by applicant | WO2016151300 | WO2018060704 | WO2019193342 | - LUGNIER, C., Pharmacol Ther, (20060000), vol. 109, pages 366 - 398 | - HOUSLAY, M.D., Prog Nucleic Acid Res Mol Biol, (20010000), vol. 69, pages 249 - 315 | - HOUSLAY, M.D.BAILLIE, G.S.MAURICE, D.H., Circ Res, (20070000), vol. 100, pages 950 - 66 | - HOUSLAY, M. D.SCHAFER, P.ZHANG, K., Drug Discovery Today, (20050000), vol. 10, pages 1503 - 1519 | - RICHTER, WCONTI, M, J. Biol. Chem., (20020000), vol. 277, pages 40212 - 40221 | - BOLGER, G. B., Cell. Signal., (20150000), vol. 27, pages 908 - 922 | - BURGIN A. B., Nat. Biotechnol., (20100000), vol. 28, pages 63 - 70 | - TAKIAR, V.CAPLAN, M., J. Biochim. Biophys. Acta, (20110000), vol. 1812, pages 1337 - 1343 | - MACKENZIE, S. J. et al., Br. J. Pharmacol., (20020000), vol. 136, pages 421 - 433 | - GRANGE et al., J. Biol. Chem., (20000000), vol. 275, pages 33379 - 33387 | - OMAR et al., PNAS, (20190000), vol. 116, pages 13320 - 13329 | - HOUSLAY, MDSULLIVAN, MBOLGER GB, Adv. Pharmacol., (19980000), vol. 44, pages 225 - 342 | - VEBER, D. F. et al., J. Med. Chem., (20020000), vol. 45, pages 2615 - 2623 | - LIPINSKI, C. A., Drug Discovery Today: Technologies, (20040000), vol. 1, pages 337 - 341 | - THOMPSON, W. J.APPLEMAN, M. M., Biochemistry, (19710000), vol. 10, pages 311 - 316 | - MARCHMONT, R. J.HOUSLAY, M. D., Biochem J, (19800000), vol. 187, pages 381 - 92 | - LANIA AMANTOVANI GSPADA A, Ann Endocrinol (Paris), (20120000), vol. 73, pages 73 - 75 | - THOMPSON, M. D., Methods Mol. Biol., (20080000), vol. 448, pages 109 - 137 | - WEINSTEIN LSLIU JSAKAMOTO AXIE TCHEN M, Endocrinology, (20040000), vol. 145, pages 5459 - 5464 | - LANIA AMANTOVANI GSPADA A, Eur J Endocrinol, (20010000), vol. 145, pages 543 - 559 | - DUPREZ, L., Nat. Genet., (19940000), vol. 7, pages 396 - 401 | - BIEBERMANN, H., J. Clin. Endocrinol. Metab., (20010000), vol. 86, pages 4429 - 4433 | - KARGES, B., J. Endocrinol., (20050000), vol. 186, pages 377 - 385 | - ARTURI, F. et al., Exp. Clin. Endocrinol. Diabetes, (19980000), vol. 106, pages 234 - 236 | - PERSANI, L., J. Clin. Endocrinol. Metab., (20000000), vol. 85, pages 2872 - 2878 | - CALVI, L.M.SCHIPANI, E., J. Endocrinol. Invest., (20000000), vol. 23, pages 545 - 554 | - LATRONICO, A.C., J Clin. Endocrinol. Metab., (19950000), vol. 80, pages 2490 - 2494 | - KOSUGI, S., Hum. Mol. Genet., (19950000), vol. 4, pages 183 - 188 | - TRITOS, N. A.BILLER, B. M., Discov. Med., (20120000), vol. 13, pages 171 - 179 | - MASOUMI, A., Drugs, (20070000), vol. 67, pages 2495 - 2510 | - YAMAGUCHI, T., Kidney Int, (20000000), vol. 57, pages 1460 - 1471 | - WALLACE, D. P., Biochim. Biophys. Acta, (20110000), vol. 1812, pages 1291 - 1300 | - TORRES, V. E., Nat. Med., (20040000), vol. 10, pages 363 - 364 | - GATTONE, V. H. et al., Nat. Med., (20030000), vol. 9, pages 1323 - 1326 | - BELIBI, F. A.EDELSTEIN, C. L., Expert Opin. Investig. Drugs., (20100000), vol. 19, pages 315 - 328 | - SUSSMAN, C. R.WARD, C. J.LEIGHTNER, A. C.SMITH, J. L.AGARWAL, R.HARRIS, P. C.TORRES, V. E., J. Am. Soc. Nephrol., (20140000), vol. 25, pages 2222 - 2230 | - SUN, Y.ZHOU, H.YANG, B-X., Acta Pharmacologica Sinica, (20110000), vol. 32, pages 805 - 816 | - STRAZZABOSCO, M.SOMLO, S., Gastroenterology, (20110000), vol. 140, pages 1855 - 1859 | - GEVERS, T. J.DRENTH, J. P., Curr. Opin. Gastroenterol., (20100000), vol. 27, pages 294 - 300 | - JANSSEN, M. J., J. Hepatol., (20100000), vol. 52, pages 432 - 440 | - GONG, A.Y., Am. J. Physiol. Cell. Physiol., (20030000), vol. 284, pages C1205 - 1214 | - MASYUK, T.V. et al., Gastroenterology, (20070000), vol. 132, pages 1104 - 1116 | - MANCUSI, S. et al., J. Nephrol., (20130000), vol. 26, pages 207 - 12 | - MA, PNAS, (20070000), vol. 104, page 20386 | - DIAZ, A.DANON, M.CRAWFORD, J., J. Pediatr. Endocrinol. Metab., (20070000), vol. 20, pages 853 - 880 | - AHUJA et al., Critical Reviews in Microbiology, (20040000), vol. 30, pages 187 - 196 | - AGARWAL et al., Nature, (20090000), vol. 460, pages 98 - 102 | - AANDAHL, E. M., FASEB J, (19980000), vol. 12, pages 855 - 862 | - NAYJIB, B., The Open Immunology Journal, (20080000), vol. 1, pages 20 - 24 | - HOLM, A. M., J. Immunol., (20030000), vol. 170, pages 5772 - 5777 | - BRECKLER, M. et al., Cell. Signal., (20110000), vol. 23, pages 1257 - 1266 | - ALMAHARIQ, M., Mol. Pharmacol., (20130000), vol. 83, pages 122 - 128 | - BALJINNYAM, E. et al., Pigment Cell Melanoma Res, (20110000), vol. 24, pages 680 - 687 | - LORENZ, R., Pancreas, (20080000), vol. 37, pages 102 - 103 | - CHO et al., Crit Rev Oncog, (20110000), vol. 16, pages 37 - 46 | - CRANS-VARGAS et al., Blood, (20020000), vol. 99, pages 2617 - 9 | - SHANKAR et al., Cancer Cell, (20050000), vol. 7, pages 351 - 62 | - MERKLE et al., Cellular Signalling, (20110000), vol. 23, pages 507 - 515 | - MISRA, U. K.PIZZO, S. V., J. Cell. Biochem., (20090000), vol. 108, pages 998 - 1011 | - MISRA, U. K.PIZZO, S. V., J. Cell. Biochem., (20120000), vol. 113, pages 1488 - 1500 | - VEZZOSI, D.BERTHERAT, J., Eur. J. Endocrinol., (20110000), vol. 165, pages 177 - 188 | - LEVY, I., Curr. Opin. Pharmacol., (20110000), vol. 11, pages 689 - 697 | - AZEVEDO, M. F.STRATAKIS, C. A., Endocr. Pract., (20110000), vol. 17, pages 2 - 7 | - HORVATH, A., Nat Genet, (20060000), vol. 38, pages 794 - 800 | - HORVATH, A., Cancer Res, (20060000), vol. 66, pages 11571 - 11575 | - LIBE, R et al., Clin. Cancer Res., (20080000), vol. 14, pages 4016 - 4024 | - HORVATH. A., Cancer Res, (20090000), vol. 69, pages 5301 - 5306 | - HORVATH, A.MERICQ, V.STRATAKIS, C. A. N., Engl. J. Med., (20080000), vol. 358, pages 750 - 752 | - HORVATH, A. et al., Eur. J. Hum. Genet., (20080000), vol. 16, pages 1245 - 1253 | - LIBE, R., J. Clin. Endocrinol. Metab., (20110000), vol. 96, pages E208 - 214 | - The Practice of Medicinal Chemistry, (20030000), pages 561 - 585 | - LEINWEBER, Drug Metab. Res., (19870000), vol. 18, page 379 | - Nat. Rev. Drug Discov., (20160000), vol. 15, no. 4, pages 219 - 21 | - LIANGCHEN, Expert Opinion in Therapeutic Patents, (20010000), vol. 11, no. 6, pages 981 - 986 | - H. LIEBERMANL. LACHMAN, Pharmaceutical Dosage Forms: Tablets, Marcel Dekker, (19800000), vol. 1 | - MAO, Z.STREETS, A. J.ONG, A. C. M., Am. J. Physiol. Renal Physiol., (20110000), vol. 300, no. 6, pages F1375 - F1384 | - HENDERSON, D. J. P.BYRNE, A.DULLA, K.JENSTER, G.HOFFMANN, R.BAILLIE, G. S.HOUSLAY, M. D., Br. J. Cancer, (20140000), vol. 110, pages 1278 - 1287 | - YATES, J Clin Invest, (19880000), vol. 81, pages 932 - 938 | - KRUSE, K.KRACHT, U., European Journal of Pediatrics, (19870000), vol. 146, pages 373 - 377 |