EP4288556 - METHODS FOR PREVENTING CARDIAC OR SKELETAL DEFECTS IN DISEASES INCLUDING MUCOPOLYSACCHARIDOSES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.11.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.08.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 11.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.2024 | New entry: Decision on request for further processing | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Regents of the University of Minnesota 600 McNamara Alumni Center 200 Oak Street SE Minneapolis, Minnesota 55455-2020 / US | For all designated states REGENXBIO Inc. 9804 Medical Center Drive Rockville, MD 20850 / US | [2023/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCIVOR, R., Scott Louis Park, Minnesota 55416 / US | 02 /
BUSS, Nicholas, Alexander, Piers, Sascha Rockville, Maryland 20852 / US | 03 /
LUND, Troy, C. Eden Prairie, Minnesota 55347 / US | 04 /
BRAUNLIN, Elizabeth Roseville, Minnesota 55113 / US | 05 /
BELUR, Lalitha, R. St. Paul, Minnesota 55116 / US | 06 /
FAIRBANKS, Carolyn St. Paul, Minnesota 55105 / US | 07 /
NEVORET, Marie-Laure Virgina Beach, Virginia 23452 / US | [2023/50] | Representative(s) | Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Straße 11 80636 München / DE | [2023/50] | Application number, filing date | 22706950.7 | 04.02.2022 | [2023/50] | WO2022US15294 | Priority number, date | US202163146383P | 05.02.2021 Original published format: US 202163146383 P | US202163185743P | 07.05.2021 Original published format: US 202163185743 P | US202163186491P | 10.05.2021 Original published format: US 202163186491 P | US202163283920P | 29.11.2021 Original published format: US 202163283920 P | [2023/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022170082 | Date: | 11.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4288556 | Date: | 13.12.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.08.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/864, A61K38/47, A61K48/00, C12N7/00 | [2023/50] | CPC: |
C12N15/86 (EP);
A61K45/06 (EP);
A61K48/005 (EP);
A61K48/0075 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07K14/47 (EP);
C12N9/16 (EP);
C12N9/2402 (EP);
C12Y301/06013 (EP);
C12Y302/01076 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP);
C12N2750/14143 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/50] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR PRÄVENTION VON HERZ- ODER SKELETTDEFEKTEN BEI KRANKHEITEN EINSCHLIESSLICH MUCOPOLYSACCHARIDOSEN | [2023/50] | English: | METHODS FOR PREVENTING CARDIAC OR SKELETAL DEFECTS IN DISEASES INCLUDING MUCOPOLYSACCHARIDOSES | [2023/50] | French: | MÉTHODES DE PRÉVENTION DE DÉFAUTS CARDIAQUES OU SQUELETTIQUES DANS DES MALADIES COMPRENANT DES MUCOPOLYSACCHARIDOSES | [2023/50] | Entry into regional phase | 21.08.2023 | National basic fee paid | 21.08.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.08.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.08.2023 | Examination requested [2023/50] | 21.08.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.04.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 12.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Request for further processing for: | 12.06.2024 | Request for further processing filed | 12.06.2024 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.06.2024 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2014186579 (UNIV MINNESOTA [US]) [X] 1-26* p. 2, penultimate §-last §, p. 6, last §-p. 8, 1st §, , p. 14, penultimate §, p. 15, 1st §-2nd §, p. 2, last §, p. 4, penultimate §-last §, p. 3, 2nd §-3rd §, p. 20, 2nd §, p. 6, 2nd §, p. 20, 2nd §, p. 3, last §;; examples 1-2 *; | [XI]WO2019010335 (UNIV PENNSYLVANIA [US]) [X] 1-21,23,25,26 * p. 9, 2nd §-3rd §, p. 11, 1st §-2nd §, p. 27, 1st §, p. 46, 2nd §, p. 47, 2nd §, p. 49, penultimate §-last §, p. 3, penultimate §, p. 28, last §, p. 16, 2nd §, p. 5, 1st §, p. 6, 2nd §, p. 50, 2nd §, p. 53, 2nd §-5th §, p. 7, last §, p. 16, 3rd §, p. 17, 3rd §, p. 43, penultimate §p. 51, last §, p. 10, penultimate §, p. 35, 3rd §-4th §, p. 16, 2nd §, p. 29, 2nd §;; examples 1-8 * [I] 22,24; | [X] - BELUR LALITHA ET AL, "Comparative systemic and neurologic effectiveness of intravenous and intrathecal AAV9 delivered individually or combined in a murine model of mucopolysaccharidosis type I", MOLECULAR GENETICS AND METABOLISM, ACADEMIC PRESS, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 132, no. 2, doi:10.1016/J.YMGME.2020.12.025, ISSN 1096-7192, (20210201), (20210201), XP086480758 [X] 1-10,13,15,16,18,20,21,23,25,26 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ymgme.2020.12.025 | by applicant | WO9413788 | WO9513392 | WO9617947 | US5656785 | US5658776 | WO9823018 | WO9827204 | WO2008049588 | - AL-GHANANEEM et al., AAPS Pharm. Sci. Tech., (20020000), vol. 2, page E5 | - ARONOVICH et al., J. Gene Med., (20070000), vol. 2, page 403 | - ARONOVICH et al., Mol. Ther., (20090000), vol. 17, page 1187 | - BAGGER et al., Eur. J. Pharm. Sci., (20040000), vol. 21, pages 235 - 242 | - BAGGER et al., Int. J. Pharm., (20040000), vol. 263, pages 311 - 322 | - BAKER et al., Exp. Brain Res., (19860000), vol. 63, page 461 | - BALIN et al., J. Comp. Neurol., (19860000), vol. 251, pages 260 - 280 | - BANKS et al., J. Drug Target, (20090000), vol. 17, pages 91 - 97 | - BANKS et al., J. Pharmacol. Exp. Ther., (20040000), vol. 309, page 469 | - BANKS, Biopolymers, (20080000), vol. 90, page 589 | - BARAKAT et al., J. Pharm. Pharmacol., (20060000), vol. 58, page 63 | - BARBIER et al., Mol. Genet. Metab., (20130000), vol. 110, page 303 | - BARNES, J. Comp. Phvsiol. Psychol., (19790000), vol. 93, page 74 | - BAUMGARTNER et al., Neuron, (20080000), vol. 58, page 639 | - BELUR et al., Mol. Ther., (20140000), vol. 22, page S236 | - BENEDICT et al., Neuroendocrinology, (20070000), vol. 86, page 136 | - BENEDICT et al., Neuropsychopharmacology, (20070000), vol. 32, page 239 | - BENEDICT et al., Psychoneuroendocrinology, (20040000), vol. 29, page 1326 | - BENNETT et al., Sci. Transl. Med., (20120000), vol. 4, pages 120 - 15 | - BJORAKER et al., J. Dev. Behav. Ped., (20060000), vol. 27, page 290 | - BLITS et al., J. Neuros. Methods, (20100000), vol. 185, page 257 | - BORN et al., Nat. Neurosci., (20020000), vol. 5, page 514 | - BOUITON et al., Am. J. Physiol., (19990000), vol. 276, page R818 | - BOUITON et al., Neuropathol. Appl. Neurobiol., (19960000), vol. 22, page 325 | - BRADBURY et al., Am. J. Physiol., (19810000), vol. 240, page F319 | - BRADBURY et al., J. Phvsiol., (19830000), vol. 339, page 519 | - BRADY, Ann. Rev. Med., (20060000), vol. 57, page 283 | - BROADWELL et al., J. Comp. Neurol., (19850000), vol. 242, page 632 | - BROEKMAN et al., Neuroscience, (20060000), vol. 139, page 1061 | - EINER-JENSEN et al., Exp. Brain Res., (20000000), vol. 130, pages 216 - 652 | - BUXER et al., J. Neurochem., (19910000), vol. 56, page 1012 | - CAMPOS et al., Meta. Brain Dis., (20120000), vol. 27, page 121 | - CAPSONI et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA., (20020000), vol. 99, page 12432 | - CARARE et al., Neuropathol. Appl. Neurobiol., (20080000), vol. 34, page 131 | - GROSS et al., J. Anat., (19820000), vol. 135, pages 83 - 69 | - COSTANTINO et al., Int. J. Pharm., (20070000), vol. 341, page 207 | - CHARLTON et al., J. Drug Target., (20070000), vol. 15, page 370 | - CHARLTON et al., Pharm. Res., (20080000), vol. 25, page 1531 | - CHEN et al., J. Alzheimers Dis., (19980000), vol. 1, page 35 | - VYAS et al., J. Pharm. Sci., (20060000), vol. 25, page 1364 | - CHEN, Mol. Ther., (20030000), vol. 8, page 495 | - CHOW et al., J. Pharm. Sci., (19990000), vol. 88, page 754 | - CHOW et al., J. Pharm. Sci., (20010000), vol. 90, page 1729 | - DAVIS et al., Clin. Pharmacokinet., (20030000), vol. 42, pages 1107 - 16 | - CSERR et al., Brain Pathol, (19920000), vol. 2, page 269 | - DAHLIN et al., Eur. J. Pharm. Sci., (20010000), vol. 14, page 75 | - DANIELYAN et al., Eur. J. Cell. Biol., (20090000), vol. 88, page 315 | - DE LORENZO, Taste and smell in vertebrates, (19700000), pages 151 - 175 | - DE ROSA et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (20050000), vol. 102, page 3811 | - DESESSO, Qual. Assur., (19930000), vol. 2, page 213 | - DESMANIS et al., Ann. Neurol., (20040000), vol. 56, page 68 | - DESNICK et al., Ann. Rev. Genom. Hum. Genet., (20120000), vol. 13, page 307 | - DESOUZA et al., Eur. Neuropsychopharmacol., (20090000), vol. 12, page 53 | - DHANDA et al., Drug Del. Tech., (20050000), vol. 5, page 64 | - DHURIA et al., J. Pharm. Sci., (20090000), vol. 98, page 2501 | - DHURIA et al., J. Pharmaceutical Sciences., (20100000), vol. 99, page 1654 | - DHURIA et al., J. Pharmacol. Exp. Ther., (20090000), vol. 328, page 312 | - DIANO et al., J. Clin. Invest., (20080000), vol. 118, page 272 | - DICKSON et al., Mol. Gen. Metab., (20070000), vol. 91, page 61 | - DJUPESLAND et al., Laryngoscope, (20060000), vol. 116, page 466 | - DOMES et al., Biol. Psychiatry., (20070000), vol. 62, page 1187 | - DUFES et al., Int. J. Pharm., (20030000), vol. 255, page 87 | - EINER-JENSEN et al., Pharmacol. Toxicol., (20000000), vol. 87, page 276 | - EINER-JENSEN et al., Reproduction, (20050000), vol. 129, page 9 | - ELLINWOOD et al., Mol. Genet. Metab., (20070000), vol. 91, page 239 | - FEHM et al., J. Clin. Endocrinol. Metab., (20010000), vol. 86, page 1144 | - FIELD et al., J. Neurocytol., (20030000), vol. 32, page 317 | - FLIEDNER et al., Endocrinology, (20060000), vol. 12, page 2088 | - FOUST et al., Nat. Biotech., (20090000), vol. 27, page 5 | - FOUST et al., Nat. Biotechnol., (20090000), vol. 27, page 59 | - FRALDI et al., Hum. Mol. Genet., (20070000), vol. 16, page 2693 | - FRANCIS et al., Brain, (20080000), vol. 131, page 3311 | - FRATANTONI et al., Science, (19680000), vol. 162, page 570 | - FREY et al., Drug Delivery, (19970000), vol. 4, page 87 | - FREY II, Drug Del. Tech., (20020000), vol. 2, page 46 | - OSBORN et al., Mol. Ther., (20110000), vol. 19, page 1025 | - FUSS et al., Eur. J. Neurosci., (20050000), vol. 22, page 2649 | - GAO et al., Biomaterials, (20060000), vol. 27, page 3482 | - GAO et al., J. Control Release., (20070000), vol. 121, page 156 | - GOPINATH et al., Current Ther. Res., (19780000), vol. 23, page 596 | - GOZES et al., Curr. Alzheimer Res., (20070000), vol. 4, page 507 | - GRAFF et al., Pharm. Res., (20030000), vol. 20, page 1225 | - KANDIMALLA et al., Pharm. Res., (20050000), vol. 22, page 1121 | - GREVERS et al., Arch. Otorhinolarvnaol., (19870000), vol. 244, page 55 | - GROOTHUIS et al., J. Cereb. Blood Flow Metab., (20070000), vol. 27, page 43 | - GUASTELLA et al., Biol. Psychiatry, (20080000), vol. 63, page 3 | - HADACZEK et al., Mol. Ther., (20060000), vol. 14, page 69 | - HALLSCHMID et al., Ragul. Pept., (20080000), vol. 149, page 79 | - HAN et al., J. Mol. Med., (20070000), vol. 85, page 75 | - HANSON et al., BMC Neurosci, (20080000), vol. 2, page S5 | - HANSON et al., Drug Del. Tech., (20040000), vol. 4, page 66 | - HARRISON et al., Learn Mem, (20060000), vol. 13, page 809 | - HARTUNG et al., J. Am. Soc. Gene Ther., (20040000), vol. 9, page 866 | - HARTUNG et al., Mol. Thera., (20040000), vol. 9, page 869 | - HASHIZUME et al., Neuro. Oncol., (20080000), vol. 10, page 112 | - HATTERER et al., Blood, (20060000), vol. 107, page 806 | - HAURIGOT et al., J. Clin. Invest., (20130000), vol. 123, page 3254 | - HERATI et al., J. Gene Med., (20080000), vol. 10, page 972 | - HESS et al., Exp. Neuro., (20040000), vol. 186, page 134 | - HINDERER et al., Hum. Gene Ther., (20160000), vol. 27, page 906 | - HOOGERBRUGGE et al., Lancet, (19950000), vol. 345, page 1398 | - HORVAT et al., Eur. J. Pharm. Biopharm., (20090000), vol. 72, page 252 | - HUDA et al., Mol. Ther. Methods Clin, Devel., (20140000), vol. 1, page 14032 | - HUSSAR et al., Chem. Senses, (20020000), vol. 27, page 7 | - ILIUM, J. Control Release., (20030000), vol. 87, page 187 | - ILIUM, J. Pharm. Pharmacol., (20040000), vol. 56, page 3 | - ITAYA et al., Brain Res, (19860000), vol. 398, page 397 | - JANSON et al., Neurosurgery, (20140000), vol. 74, page 99 | - JANSSON et al., J. Drug Target., (20020000), vol. 10, page 285 | - JOGANI et al., Alzheimer Dis. Assoc. Disord., (20080000), vol. 22, page 116 | - JOHNSTON et al., Cerebrospinal Fluid Res, (20040000), vol. 1, page 2 | - KAKKIS, Mol. Gen. Met., (20040000), vol. 83, page 163 | - KANDIMALLA et al., J. Pharm. Sci., (20050000), vol. 94, page 1577 | - KAUFMANN et al., EMBO Mol. Med., (20130000), vol. 5, page 1642 | - KIDA et al., Neuropathol. Appl. Neurobiol., (19930000), vol. 19, page 480 | - KIRSCH et al., J. Neurosci., (20050000), vol. 25, page 11489 | - KLEIN et al., J. Am. Soc. Gene Ther., (20060000), vol. 13, page 517 | - KOOS et al., Neuroreport, (20050000), vol. 16, page 1929 | - KOSFELD et al., Nature, (20050000), vol. 435, page 673 | - KRISTENSSON et al., Acta Neuropathol (Berl), (19710000), vol. 12, page 145 | - KRIVIT, Springer Seminars in Immunopathotogy, (20040000), vol. 26, page 119 | - KUMAR et al., Curr. Sci., (19740000), vol. 43, page 435 | - KUMAR et al., Int. J. Pharm., (20080000), vol. 358, page 285 | - LI et al., Chin. J. Phvsiol., (20050000), vol. 48, page 7 | - LI et al., Glia, (20050000), vol. 52, page 245 | - LI et al., J. Neurocvtol., (20050000), vol. 34, page 343 | - LOCK et al., Hum. Gene Ther., (20100000), vol. 21, no. 1259 | - LUM et al., J. Inherit. Metab. Pis., (20170000), vol. 40, page 455 | - LUZZATI et al., J. Mol. Biol., (20040000), vol. 343, page 199 | - OWENS et al., Diabet. Med., (20030000), vol. 20, pages 886 - 113 | - MARTINEZ et al., Neuroscience, (20080000), vol. 152, page 785 | - MCKINNIS et al., J. Pediatr., (19960000), vol. 129, page 145 | - MIRAGALL et al., J. Comp. Neurol., (19940000), vol. 341, page 433 | - MIYAKAWA et al., Hippocampus, (20010000), vol. 11, page 763 | - MOTAS et al., JCI Insight, (20160000), page e86696 | - MUENZER, J. Pediatrics, (20040000), vol. 144, page S27 | - MUNOZ-ROJAS et al., Am. J. Med. Gen., (20080000), vol. 146A, page 2538 | - NAKAI et al., J. Virol., (20050000), vol. 29, page 214 | - NATHWANI et al., New Engl. J. Med., (20140000), vol. 371, page 1994 | - NONAKA et al., J. Pharmacol. Exp. Ther., (20080000), vol. 325, page 513 | - OHLFEST et al., Blood, (20050000), vol. 105, page 2691 | - ORCHARD et al., J. Pediatrics, (20070000), vol. 151, page 340 | - OU et al., Mol. Genet. Metab., (20140000), vol. 111, page 116 | - PACAK et al., Circ. Res., (20060000), pages e3 - e9 | - PAN et al., Brain Res, (20080000), vol. 1188, page 241 | - PARDRIDGE, NeuroRx, (20050000), vol. 2, page 3 | - PARKER, Psychoneuroenclocrinology, (20050000), vol. 30, page 924 | - PASTORES, Exp. Opin. Biol. Ther., (20080000), vol. 8, page 1003 | - PAYLOR et al., Phvsiol. Behav., (20010000), vol. 73, page 781 | - PEREIRA et al., Clin. Chim. Acta:lnt. J. Clin. Chem., (20080000), vol. 387, page 75 | - PERL et al., Lancet, (19870000), vol. 1, page 1028 | - PETERS et al., Bone Marrow Transpl, (20030000), vol. 31, page 229 | - POLITO et al., Am. J. Hum. Genet., (20090000), vol. 25, page 296 | - POLLOCK et al., J. Anat., (19970000), vol. 191, page 337 | - RAGHAVAN et al., J. Larvnaol. Otol., (20000000), vol. 114, page 456 | - RAO et al., Ped. Res., (20130000), vol. 73, page 31 | - REGER et al., J. Alzheimers Dis., (20080000), vol. 13, page 323 | - REGER et al., Neurobiol. Aging., (20060000), vol. 27, page 451 | - REGER et al., Neurology, (20080000), vol. 70, page 440 | - RENNELS et al., Adv. Neurol., (19900000), vol. 52, page 431 | - RENNETS et al., Brain Res, (19850000), vol. 326, page 47 | - REOLON et al., Brain Res, (20060000), vol. 1076, page 225 | - REOLON et al., Cell. Mol. Neurobiol., (20090000), vol. 29, page 443 | - RIMMELE et al., J. Neurosci., (20090000), vol. 29, page 38 | - ROBERTS et al., Pediatr. Res., (20060000), vol. 60, page 309 | - ROSS et al., J. Neuroimmunol., (20040000), vol. 151, page 66 | - ROSS et al., Neurosci. Lett., (20080000), vol. 439, page 30 | - SABOURDY et al., Orphanet. J. Rare Dis., (20150000), vol. 10, page 31 | - SAKANE et al., J. Pharm. Pharmacol., (19940000), vol. 46, page 378 | - SAKANE et al., J. Pharm. Pharmacol., (19950000), vol. 47, page 379 | - SCHAEFER et al., J. Comp. Neurol., (20020000), vol. 444, page 221 | - SCHEIBE et al., Arch. Otolaryngol. Head Neck Surg., (20080000), vol. 134, page 643 | - SCHLEY et al., J. Theor. Biol., (20060000), vol. 238, page 962 | - SCHULZ et al., Endocrinology, (20040000), vol. 145, page 2696 | - SCHUSTER et al., Front Neuroanat, (20140000), vol. 8, page 42 | - SCOTT et al., Am. J. Hum. Genet., (19930000), vol. 53, page 973 | - SEEGER et al., J. Neurosci., (20040000), vol. 24, page 10117 | - SHIMIZU et al., Int. J. Obes. (Lond), (20050000), vol. 29, page 858 | - SHIPLEY, Brain Res. Bull, (19850000), vol. 15, page 129 | - SKIPOR et al., Reprod. Biol., (20030000), vol. 2, page 143 | - STEEN et al., J. Alzheimers Pis., (20050000), vol. 7, page 63 | - SOUZA et al., "Studying learning and memory in animals: A look into cognitive function", Cognitive Behavioral Therapy: Applications. Methods and Outcomes, (20120000), vol. 4, no. 3, pages 37 - 70 | - STEFANCZYK-KRZYMOWSKA et al., Exp. Phvsiol., (20000000), vol. 85, page 801 | - TAKANO et al., J. Histochem. Cytochem., (20050000), vol. 53, page 611 | - TANAKA et al., Moi. Genet. Metab., (20120000), vol. 107, page 513 | - TAYLOR et al., Biol. Blood Marrow Transpl., (20190000), vol. 25, page e226 | - THORNE et al., Brain Res, (19950000), vol. 692, page 278 | - THORNE et al., Clin. Pharmacokinet., (20010000), vol. 40, page 907 | - THORNE et al., Neuroscience, (20040000), vol. 127, page 481 | - TKAC et al., Mag. Res. In Med., (19990000), vol. 41, page 649 | - TKAC et al., Mag. Res. In Med., (20030000), vol. 50, page 24 | - UNGER et al., J. Neuropath. Exp. Neuro., (19930000), vol. 52, page 460 | - VAN DEN BERG et al., Eur. J. Pharm. Biopharm., (20040000), vol. 58, page 131 | - VAN DEN BERG et al., J. Drug Target., (20030000), vol. 11, page 325 | - VAN DEN BERG et al., J. Neurosci. Methods, (20020000), vol. 116, page 99 | - VAN DEN BERG et al., Pharm. Res., (20040000), vol. 21, page 799 | - VAN DIEST et al., J. Anat., (19790000), vol. 128, page 293 | - VELLODI et al., J. Inherit Metab. Dis., (19990000), vol. 22, page 638 | - VULCHANOVA et al., Mol. Pain., (20100000), vol. 6, page 31 | - VYAS et al., AAPS PharmSciTech, (20060000), vol. 7, page E1 | - VYAS et al., Crit. Rev. Ther. Drug Carrier Svst., (20060000), vol. 22, page 319 | - VYAS et al., J. Drug Target, (20050000), vol. 12, page 317 | - WALTER et al., Arch. Histol. Cytol., (20060000), vol. 69, page 37 | - WALTER et al., Neuropathol. Appl. Neurobiol., (20060000), vol. 32, page 388 | - WANG et al., Cancer Chemother. Pharmacol., (20060000), vol. 57, page 97 | - WANG et al., Eur. J. Pharm. Biopharm., (20080000), vol. 70, page 735 | - WANG et al., Int. J. Pharm., (20060000), vol. 317, page 40 | - WELLER et al., Neurol. Res., (20030000), vol. 25, page 611 | - WESTIN et al., Eur. J. Pharm. Sci., (20050000), vol. 24, page 565 | - WESTIN et al., Pharm. Res., (20060000), vol. 23, page 565 | - WHITLEY et al., Am. J. Med. Genet., (19930000), vol. 46, page 209 | - WILLIAMS et al., J. Comp. Neurol., (20040000), vol. 470, page 50 | - WIOLAND et al., J. Histochem. Cytochem., (20000000), vol. 48, page 1215 | - WOLF et al., Neurobio. Dis., (20110000), vol. 43, page 123 | - WOLF et al., Neurology, (20040000), vol. 62, page 1503 | - YAMADA et al., Am. J. Physiol., (19910000), vol. 261, page H1197 | - ZHANG et al., Acta Neuropathol. (Berl)., (19920000), vol. 83, page 233 | - ZHANG et al., Acta Pharmacol. Sin., (20040000), vol. 25, page 522 | - ZHANG et al., int. J. Pharm., (20040000), vol. 275, page 85 | - ZHANG et al., J. Drug Target., (20060000), vol. 14, page 281 | - ZHAO et al., Acta Pharmacol. Sin., (20070000), vol. 22, page 273 | - ZHAO et al., Chin. Med. Sci. J., (20040000), vol. 12, page 257 | - ZHENG et al., Mol. Genet. Metab., (20030000), vol. 79, page 233 |