EP4298417 - DEVICE FOR MEASURING A SECONDARY VACUUM PRESSURE, AND ON-BOARD SYSTEM FOR MEASURING A RESIDUAL VACUUM PRESSURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.12.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.09.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 14.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | 27.04.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Saint-Gobain Glass France Tour Saint-Gobain 12 Place de l'Iris 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [2024/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KHARCHENKO, Andriy 91120 PALAISEAU / FR | [2024/01] | Representative(s) | Saint-Gobain Recherche B.P. 135 39, quai Lucien Lefranc 93303 Aubervilliers Cedex / FR | [2024/01] | Application number, filing date | 22707439.0 | 23.02.2022 | [2024/01] | WO2022EP54505 | Priority number, date | FR20210001859 | 25.02.2021 Original published format: FR 2101859 | [2024/01] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022180085 | Date: | 01.09.2022 | Language: | FR | [2022/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4298417 | Date: | 03.01.2024 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.09.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01L21/34, C23C14/54, H01J41/06, C23C14/34, C23C14/56 | [2024/01] | CPC: |
G01L21/34 (EP);
C23C14/34 (EP);
C23C14/568 (EP);
H01J41/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/01] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR MESSUNG EINES SEKUNDÄRVAKUUMDRUCKS UND BORDSYSTEM ZUR MESSUNG EINES RESTVAKUUMDRUCKS | [2024/01] | English: | DEVICE FOR MEASURING A SECONDARY VACUUM PRESSURE, AND ON-BOARD SYSTEM FOR MEASURING A RESIDUAL VACUUM PRESSURE | [2024/01] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE MESURE DE PRESSION VIDE SECONDAIRE ET SYSTÈME EMBARQUÉ POUR MESURE DE PRESSION DE VIDE RÉSIDUEL | [2024/01] | Entry into regional phase | 25.09.2023 | National basic fee paid | 25.09.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.09.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.09.2023 | Examination requested [2024/01] | 25.09.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]US2643342 (SIMPSON KENNETH M) [Y] 1-11 * abstract * * column 1, lines 3-5 * [A] 12-16; | [YDA]FR1485659 (ALCATEL SA) [YD] 1-11 * abstract * * columns 1,2 * [A] 12-16; | [A]EP0413291 (HAUZER HOLDING [NL]) [A] 1-16 * abstract * * column 7, lines 35-45 * * column 13, lines 35-37 *; | [A]WO2019110948 (SAINT GOBAIN [FR]) [A] 12-16* abstract * | by applicant | US2197079 | FR1485659 | US4009090 | US4166018 | WO9634124 | WO0238826 | US2005236276 |