EP4278627 - METHOD, COMPUTER PROGRAM, COMPUTER-READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM AND SYSTEM FOR PROVIDING INFORMATION TO BE PROTECTED WHICH RELATES TO A PASSENGER TRANSPORT VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.10.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.09.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 15.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | 03.05.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Mobility GmbH Otto-Hahn-Ring 6 81739 München / DE | [2023/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JUNG, Hermann 91085 Weisendorf / DE | 02 /
LENZ, Stefan 85617 Aßling / DE | 03 /
ROTHER, Gerd 81375 München / DE | 04 /
SCHEIBE, Hagen 85521 Ottobrunn / DE | [2023/47] | Representative(s) | Siemens Patent Attorneys Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [2023/47] | Application number, filing date | 22707642.9 | 07.02.2022 | [2023/47] | WO2022EP52852 | Priority number, date | DE202110201847 | 26.02.2021 Original published format: DE102021201847 | [2023/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022179837 | Date: | 01.09.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4278627 | Date: | 22.11.2023 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.09.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04W4/42, H04W4/44, H04W12/033, H04L9/40 | [2023/47] | CPC: |
H04W4/42 (EP);
H04L67/12 (EP);
H04W12/033 (EP);
H04W4/44 (EP);
H04L63/0442 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/47] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, COMPUTERPROGRAMM, COMPUTERLESBARES SPEICHERMEDIUM UND SYSTEM ZUM BEREITSTELLEN VON ZU SCHÜTZENDEN INFORMATIONEN EINES PERSONENBEFÖRDERUNGSFAHRZEUGES | [2023/47] | English: | METHOD, COMPUTER PROGRAM, COMPUTER-READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM AND SYSTEM FOR PROVIDING INFORMATION TO BE PROTECTED WHICH RELATES TO A PASSENGER TRANSPORT VEHICLE | [2023/47] | French: | PROCÉDÉ, PROGRAMME INFORMATIQUE, SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE LISIBLE PAR ORDINATEUR ET SYSTÈME POUR FOURNIR DES INFORMATIONS À PROTÉGER QUI CONCERNENT UN VÉHICULE DE TRANSPORT DE PASSAGERS | [2023/47] | Entry into regional phase | 17.08.2023 | National basic fee paid | 17.08.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.08.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.08.2023 | Examination requested [2023/47] | 17.08.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1632903 (MERKLE ALEXANDER [DE]) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0001] - [0011] * * paragraphs [0023] - [0034]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0048] *; | [XI]US2012237028 (KHAZAN ROGER [US], et al) [X] 1-6,9-11 * paragraphs [0002] - [0004] * * paragraphs [0027] - [0036] - [0046]; figure 1 * * paragraphs [0057] - [0059]; figure 4 * * paragraphs [0064] - [0068] * * paragraph [0114] * [I] 7,8; | [A]US2016219251 (VÄRE JANI [FI], et al) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0004] - [0011] * * paragraphs [0031] - [0036]; figure 1 ** paragraphs [0055] - [0058]; figure 8 *; | [A] - MARTIN WELLER ET AL, "Public Key Infrastructure (PKI) in der Leit- und Sicherungstechnik - LSTPublic Key Infrastructure (PKI) in operations control and signalling technology", SIGNAL UND DRAHT: SIGNALLING & DATACOMMUNICATION, DE, (20190212), vol. 111, no. 1+2, ISSN 0037-4997, pages 31 - 38, XP055555867 [A] 1-11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] - [04.2] * |