EP4294485 - PRESSURE SUPPORT DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.11.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.08.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 15.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | 27.04.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2023/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORGAN, Stephan Daniel 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
UZONYI, Adrienne K. Fazio 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
CATALANO, Thomas 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | 04 /
WINSKI, Jeffrey Ronald 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2023/52] | Representative(s) | Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2023/52] | Application number, filing date | 22707686.6 | 21.02.2022 | [2023/52] | WO2022EP54170 | Priority number, date | US202163151824P | 22.02.2021 Original published format: US 202163151824 P | [2023/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022175503 | Date: | 25.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4294485 | Date: | 27.12.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.08.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61M16/00, A61B5/08, A61B5/00, G16H50/30 | [2023/52] | CPC: |
A61M16/0066 (EP);
A61M16/0051 (EP,US);
A61B5/087 (EP);
A61B5/4836 (EP);
A61M16/0003 (US);
A61M16/0069 (EP);
A61M16/024 (EP);
A61M16/026 (EP,US);
A61M16/06 (EP,US);
G16H20/40 (EP);
G16H40/63 (EP);
A61M16/204 (EP);
A61M16/208 (EP);
A61M2016/0027 (US);
A61M2016/003 (US);
A61M2016/0039 (EP);
A61M2205/3337 (EP);
A61M2205/3553 (EP);
A61M2205/3569 (EP);
A61M2205/3584 (EP);
A61M2205/3592 (EP);
A61M2205/502 (EP);
A61M2205/505 (EP);
A61M2205/52 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/52] | Title | German: | DRUCKUNTERSTÜTZUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2023/52] | English: | PRESSURE SUPPORT DEVICE | [2023/52] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SUPPORT DE PRESSION | [2023/52] | Entry into regional phase | 22.09.2023 | National basic fee paid | 22.09.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.09.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.09.2023 | Examination requested [2023/52] | 22.09.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO2018115216 (KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS NV [NL]) [X] 8,13,14 * figure all * * claims 9,16,17 * * paragraphs [0062] , [0055] *[I] 12,15; | [XI]WO2020136035 (KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS NV [NL]) [X] 8-10,13,14 * figure all * * claims 1,7,15 * * paragraphs [0028] , [0029] , [0035] - [0037] * [I] 11,12,15 | by applicant | US5148802 | US5313937 | US5433193 | US5632269 | US5803065 | US6029664 | US6539940 | US6626175 | US7011091 |