EP4294206 - INGREDIENTS AND METHOD FOR THE PREPARATION OF 'AUTEUR DRINKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.11.2023 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.08.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 15.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | 19.04.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TECNOBLEND SRL Via G. Mameli 6 70022 Altamura (BA) / IT | [2023/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRACCASCIA, Gianluca 70023 Gioia del Colle (BA) / IT | 02 /
NICOLETTI, Francesco 70022 Altamura (BA) / IT | [2023/52] | Representative(s) | Bruni, Giovanni Laforgia, Bruni & Partners Corso Duca degli Abruzzi, 2 10128 Torino / IT | [2023/52] | Application number, filing date | 22707846.6 | 11.02.2022 | [2023/52] | WO2022IB51242 | Priority number, date | IT20210003635 | 17.02.2021 Original published format: IT202100003635 | [2023/52] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022175794 | Date: | 25.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4294206 | Date: | 27.12.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.08.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A23L2/385, A23L2/68, A23L29/30, C12G3/04, C12G3/06, C13B50/00, B01L3/02 | [2023/52] | CPC: |
A23L2/385 (EP);
C12G3/06 (EP,US);
A23L2/60 (EP);
A23L2/68 (EP);
A23L27/13 (US);
A23L33/105 (EP);
A47J43/27 (US);
B65D1/02 (US);
B65D41/02 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/52] | Title | German: | ZUTATEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON AUTERURGETRÄNKEN | [2023/52] | English: | INGREDIENTS AND METHOD FOR THE PREPARATION OF 'AUTEUR DRINKS | [2023/52] | French: | INGRÉDIENTS ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION DE « BOISSONS D'AUTEUR » | [2023/52] | Entry into regional phase | 23.08.2023 | National basic fee paid | 23.08.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.08.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.12.2022 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.08.2023 | Examination requested [2023/52] | 23.08.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]EP0275754 (MOREL SIMONE) [I] 5,6 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0002]; figures 1,2 *; | [I]FR2972903 (SUZANNE JACQUIS [FR]) [I] 1-9 * claims 1-7 *; | [I] - Anonymous, "Canadou citron vert", (20180101), URL: https://www.carrefour.fr/p/sirop-de-canne-au-citron-canadou-3012993063334, (20211028), XP055855877 [I] 1-9 * the whole document * | [I] - Anonymous, "Canadou se presse sur le citron / Nouveaux produits - Rayon Boissons", (20180206), URL: https://www.rayon-boissons.com/nouveaux-produits/canadou-se-presse-sur-le-citron-53673, (20211028), XP055855872 [I] 1-9 * the whole document * | [A] - Anonymous, "Table - sucrose solutions, composition, viscosity, density", (20190317), URL: https://web.archive.org/web/20190317170133/https://lclane.net/text/sucrose.html, (20211027), XP055855601 [A] 1-9 * the whole document * | [I] - anonymous, "Beverage Concentrate", GNPD, MINTEL, (20080502), Database accession no. 907647, URL: https://www.gnpd.com/sinatra/recordpage/907647/, XP055855603 [I] 1-9 * abstract * | [I] - Schloss Andrew, "Homemade Liqueurs and Infused Spirits : Innovative Flavor Combinations, Plus Homemade Versions of Kahlúa, Cointreau, and Other Popular Liqueurs", Homemade Liqueurs and Infused Spirits : Innovative Flavor Combinations, Plus Homemade Versions of Kahlúa, Cointreau, and Other Popular Liqueurs, (20131119), XP055855992 [I] 1-9 * page 24 * * page 35 * * page 42 * |