EP4178460 - STAPLE CARTRIDGE COMPRISING A POWER MANAGEMENT CIRCUIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.04.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.09.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 15.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | 03.05.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cilag GmbH International Gubelstrasse 34 6300 Zug / CH | [2023/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHELTON, IV, Frederick E. Cincinnati, Ohio 45242 / US | 02 /
ADAMS, Shane R. Cincinnati, Ohio 45242 / US | 03 /
ARONHALT, Taylor W. Cincinnati, Ohio 45242 / US | 04 /
HUNTER, Morgan R. Cincinnati, Ohio 45242 / US | 05 /
CREAMER, Patrick L. New Orleans, Louisiana 70118 / US | 06 /
HARRIS, Jason L. Cincinnati, Ohio 45242 / US | [2023/20] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2023/20] | Application number, filing date | 22707859.9 | 23.02.2022 | [2023/20] | WO2022IB51577 | Priority number, date | US202117186407 | 26.02.2021 Original published format: US202117186407 | [2023/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2022180528 | Date: | 01.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/35] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4178460 | Date: | 17.05.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.09.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/072, A61B90/98, A61B17/00, A61B90/00, G06K19/00, H02J7/00, H05K1/00, G01L5/00 | [2023/20] | CPC: |
A61B17/07207 (EP,US);
A61B90/98 (EP);
H02J50/005 (EP);
H02J50/12 (EP);
H02J50/80 (EP);
H02J7/0048 (EP);
A61B2017/00026 (EP);
A61B2017/00084 (EP);
A61B2017/00221 (EP);
A61B2017/00725 (EP);
A61B2017/00734 (EP);
A61B2017/00929 (EP);
A61B2017/07264 (EP);
A61B2017/07271 (EP,US);
A61B2017/07278 (EP,US);
A61B2090/037 (EP);
A61B2090/038 (EP);
A61B2090/065 (EP);
A61B2560/0214 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/20] | Title | German: | KLAMMERPATRONE MIT EINER LEISTUNGSVERWALTUNGSSCHALTUNG | [2023/20] | English: | STAPLE CARTRIDGE COMPRISING A POWER MANAGEMENT CIRCUIT | [2023/20] | French: | CARTOUCHE D'AGRAFES COMPRENANT UN CIRCUIT DE GESTION DE PUISSANCE | [2023/20] | Entry into regional phase | 07.02.2023 | National basic fee paid | 07.02.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.02.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/20] | 07.02.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2010007307 (BAARMAN DAVID W [US], et al); | [A]US2016270780 (HALL STEVEN G [US], et al); | [XY]US2018125590 (GIORDANO JAMES R [US], et al); | [A]EP3756613 (ETHICON LLC [PR]) | by applicant | US20203453549 | US822206 | US826405 | US847989 | US850617 | US5403312 | US5817084 | US5878193 | US6132368 | US6978921 | US6988649 | US7000818 | US7044352 | US7143923 | US2007175955 | US7422139 | US7464849 | US7524320 | US7670334 | US7753245 | US2010264194 | US7845537 | US7980443 | US8210411 | US8220688 | US8308040 | US8393514 | US8561870 | US8608045 | US8622274 | US8632525 | US8733613 | US2014249557 | US2014246475 | US2014263541 | US2014263552 | US8991678 | US9050083 | US9072535 | US9101358 | US2015272582 | US2015272580 | US2015272571 | US2015272557 | WO2015153642 | US2015297228 | US2015297233 | US9171244 | US2015324317 | US2016066913 | US9307986 | US9326767 | US9332987 | US9345481 | US9351726 | US9351727 | US9358003 | US9398911 | US2016249910 | US2016256071 | US9468438 | US9554794 | US9629623 | US9629629 | US9649110 | WO2017083125 | WO2017083126 | US9687230 | US9690362 | US9700309 | US9724094 | US2017224332 | US2017224334 | US9733663 | US2017231627 | US2017231628 | US9737301 | US9743929 | US9750499 | US9757128 | US2017265954 | US2017265865 | US2017281171 | US2017281186 | US2017281173 | US2017281189 | US9782169 | US2017290586 | US9788836 | US9804618 | US9801626 | US9808246 | US9808244 | US9814460 | US9820738 | US9826977 | US9826976 | US9833241 | US9844369 | US9844374 | US9844375 | US9844368 | US2017367695 | US9867612 | US9872722 | US9877721 | US9883860 | US9888919 | US9895148 | US9901342 | WO2018049206 | US9924961 | US9931118 | US9943309 | US2018125481 | US9968355 | US9987000 | US9993248 | US9993258 | US2018168649 | US2018168651 | US2018168633 | US2018168584 | US2018168597 | US2018168608 | US2018168609 | US2018168610 | US2018168614 | US2018168615 | US2018168625 | US2018168617 | US2018168627 | US2018168598 | US2018168586 | US2018168648 | US2018168647 | US2018168650 | US2018168590 | US2018168592 | US2018168575 | US2018168618 | US2018168619 | US2018168623 | US2018168577 | US2018168578 | US2018168579 | US2018168628 | US10004501 | US10004497 | US10010324 | US10013049 | US10016199 | US10028761 | US10032719 | US10045776 | US10045779 | US10052102 | US10052044 | US2018250002 | US10085748 | US10085749 | US10111679 | US10117649 | US10135242 | US10136887 | US10149680 | US10149683 | US10154841 | US10159483 | US10178992 | US10180463 | US10182818 | US10182816 | US10188385 | US10201364 | US10226250 | US10245029 | US10245030 | US10245033 | US10245028 | US10245027 | US10258331 | US10265068 | US10271851 | US10285705 | US10292704 | US10299792 | US10307159 | US10314582 | US10321907 | US10335149 | US2019200981 | US2019207911 | US2019206004 | US2019201141 | US2019206551 | US2019201116 | US2019201143 | US2019205566 | US2019200863 | US2019205567 | US2019201140 | US2019201033 | US2019201115 | US2019201104 | US2019201105 | US2019205001 | US2019201112 | US2019206050 | US2019200905 | US2019200906 | US2019206003 | US2019201114 | US2019206555 | US2019201144 | US2019201119 | US2019201138 | US2019206561 | US2019201111 | US2019201139 | US2019201113 | US2019201142 | US2019201135 | US2019201145 | US2019201118 | US2019201120 | US2019201136 | US10342543 | US10350016 | US10357246 | US10368865 | US10368861 | US10376263 | US10405863 | US10405857 | US10413293 | US10413297 | US10413291 | US10420552 | US10426471 | US2019298350 | US2019298340 | US2019298354 | US2019298341 | US2019298342 | US2019298356 | US2019298347 | US2019298357 | US2019298343 | US2019298352 | US2019298353 | US2019298355 | US2019298346 | US10433849 | US10433837 | US10441279 | US10448950 | US10448948 | US10456140 | US10456137 | US10470768 | US10470764 | US10470762 | US10478190 | US10485543 | US10485542 | US10492785 | US10499914 | US10517595 | US10517596 | US10524789 | US10531874 | US10537325 | US10537324 | US10542982 | US10542979 | US10542991 | US10548504 | US10561422 | US2020054323 | US2020054326 | US2020054322 | US2020054320 | US2020054321 | US2020054328 | US2020054330 | US10568626 | US10568625 | US10568632 | US10582928 | US10588632 | US10588630 | US10588631 | US10588625 | US10595887 | US10603036 | US10610224 | US10617414 | US10617412 | US10624635 | US10631858 | US10639035 | US10639034 | US10653413 | US10667811 | US10667809 | US10667810 | US10675026 | US10675025 | US10675024 | US10675021 | US10682138 | US10682136 | US10687810 | US10687809 | US10687806 | US10695055 | US10702270 | US10709446 | US10722233 | US10736629 | US10758229 | US10758230 | US10779821 | US10779823 | US10813638 | US2020345353 | US2020345354 | US2020345446 | US2020345355 | US2020345356 | US2020345357 | US2020345358 | US2020345359 | US2020345360 | US10835247 | US10835246 | US10835245 | US10842492 | US10849697 | US10856870 | US10856868 | US10856867 | US2020405301 | US10881401 | US10881399 | US10888322 | US10892899 | US10893864 | US10893863 | US10898186 | US10912559 | US10918385 | US19790170841 | US19900170841 | US19580170842 | US20060170842 | US20150170842 | US19800170841 | US19880170841 | US20100628073 | US20190628073 | US20090628073 | US20020626493 | US19940626492 | US20000626493 | US20090626493 | US20100626493 | US19910626492 | US19960626492 | US19330626493 | US20150626493 | US20130626493 | US20200626493 | US20070626493 | US20230626493 | US19870626508 | US19650618123 | US19760618123 | US19820618123 | US19850618123 | US19720618123 | US19410626113 | US19400626113 | US19390626113 | US19930170841 | US19980161050 | US19980170841 | US20050168463 | US20050170842 | US20070162817 | US20080168463 | US20080235782 | US20080235972 | US20080249117 | US20080343803 | US20090647100 |