EP4301887 - METHOD FOR RECYCLING WASTE MATERIALS GENERATED IN A STAINLESS STEEL MAKING PROCESS IN A STAINLESS STEEL MILL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.12.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.09.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 23.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.06.2024 | New entry: Decision on request for further processing | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ORBIX SOLUTIONS Rue du Dria 46 6240 Farciennes / BE | [2024/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN MECHELEN, Dirk 2830 Tisselt / BE | 02 /
COENEN, Nico 3511 Kuringen / BE | [2024/02] | Representative(s) | Gevers Patents De Kleetlaan 7A 1831 Diegem / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2024/02] | Gevers Patents Intellectual Property House Holidaystraat 5 1831 Diegem / BE | Application number, filing date | 22709316.8 | 02.03.2022 | [2024/02] | WO2022EP55227 | Priority number, date | BE20210005167 | 04.03.2021 Original published format: BE 202105167 | [2024/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022184756 | Date: | 09.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4301887 | Date: | 10.01.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.09.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C22B1/00, C22B26/22, C01F5/06, C01F5/24, C21C5/54, C22B1/242, C22B1/244 | [2024/02] | CPC: |
C22B1/005 (EP);
C21C5/54 (EP);
C22B1/242 (EP);
C22B1/244 (EP);
Y02P10/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/02] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR WIEDERVERWERTUNG VON ABFALLSTOFFEN, DIE IN EINEM EDELSTAHLHERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN IN EINEM EDELSTAHLWALZWERK ERZEUGT WURDEN | [2024/02] | English: | METHOD FOR RECYCLING WASTE MATERIALS GENERATED IN A STAINLESS STEEL MAKING PROCESS IN A STAINLESS STEEL MILL | [2024/02] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE RECYCLAGE DE DÉCHETS GÉNÉRÉS DANS UN PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D?ACIER INOXYDABLE DANS UNE INSTALLATION DE FABRICATION D?ACIER INOXYDABLE | [2024/02] | Entry into regional phase | 04.10.2023 | National basic fee paid | 04.10.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.10.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.10.2023 | Examination requested [2024/02] | 04.10.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Request for further processing for: | 06.06.2024 | Request for further processing filed | 06.06.2024 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.06.2024 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2024 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   05.06.2024 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5397379 (BARKER BRUCE J [US], et al) [A] 15-21 * claims 1-5, 22, 25 * * column 5, line 25 - column 6, line 4 * * column 8, line 11 - line 21 *; | [A]GB2529874 (DARLOW LLOYD & SONS LTD [GB]) [A] 3,6,8 * claim 52 ** pages 34, 38 *; | [XI]US2018187276 (STEIN JOSEPH L [US]) [X] 1,2,4,5,7,10-13,15-18,22,23,26,27 * examples 1, 2 * * claims 2, 4, 5, 9-12, 14 * * paragraphs [0005] , [0 11] , [0 28] , [0 29] , [0 32] , [0 33] * [I] 3,6,8,9,14,19-21,24,25 | by applicant | EP3842399 | EP3901289 |