EP4294913 - FUSION PROTEINS COMPRISING TWO RING DOMAINS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.11.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.08.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 23.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | 27.04.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states United Kingdom Research and Innovation Polaris House North Star Avenue Swindon SN2 1FL / GB | [2023/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KISS, Leo Swindon, SN2 1FL / GB | 02 /
CLIFT, Dean Swindon, SN2 1FL / GB | 03 /
LUPTAK, Jakub Swindon, SN2 1FL / GB | 04 /
JAMES, Leo Swindon, SN2 1FL / GB | [2023/52] | Representative(s) | Callaghan, Dayle Anne, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [2023/52] | Application number, filing date | 22709661.7 | 22.02.2022 | [2023/52] | WO2022EP54370 | Priority number, date | GB20210002471 | 22.02.2021 Original published format: GB 202102471 | [2023/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022175549 | Date: | 25.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4294913 | Date: | 27.12.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.08.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C12N9/10, C12N15/62 | [2023/52] | CPC: |
C12N9/104 (EP,KR,US);
A61P25/14 (KR);
A61P25/28 (KR);
A61P31/18 (KR);
C07K14/705 (US);
C12N15/86 (KR,US);
A61K2039/505 (KR);
A61K38/00 (KR);
C07K2319/70 (EP,KR);
C07K2319/73 (EP,US);
C07K2319/95 (EP,KR);
C12N2750/14143 (KR,US);
C12Y203/02 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/52] | Title | German: | FUSIONSPROTEINE MIT ZWEI RINGDOMÄNEN | [2023/52] | English: | FUSION PROTEINS COMPRISING TWO RING DOMAINS | [2023/52] | French: | PROTÉINES DE FUSION COMPRENANT DEUX DOMAINES ANNULAIRES | [2023/52] | Entry into regional phase | 25.08.2023 | National basic fee paid | 25.08.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.08.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.08.2023 | Examination requested [2023/52] | 25.08.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2012010855 (MEDICAL RES COUNCIL [GB], et al); |