EP4313704 - METHOD FOR ACTUATING A VEHICLE BRAKE SYSTEM OF A VEHICLE, AND TOWING VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.09.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 23.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | 31.05.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZF CV Systems Global GmbH Giacomettistrasse 1 3006 Bern / CH | [2024/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN THIEL, Julian 30938 Grossburgwedel / DE | [2024/06] | Representative(s) | Rabe, Dirk-Heinrich ZF CV Systems Hannover GmbH Am Lindener Hafen 21 30453 Hannover / DE | [2024/06] | Application number, filing date | 22709702.9 | 01.03.2022 | [2024/06] | WO2022EP55118 | Priority number, date | DE202110107303 | 24.03.2021 Original published format: DE102021107303 | [2024/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022199992 | Date: | 29.09.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4313704 | Date: | 07.02.2024 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.09.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B60T7/20, B60T8/17 | [2024/06] | CPC: |
B60T7/20 (EP,US);
B60T8/1708 (EP,US);
B60T2230/06 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/06] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM ANSTEUERN EINES FAHRZEUG-BREMSSYSTEMS EINES FAHRZEUGS UND ZUGFAHRZEUG | [2024/06] | English: | METHOD FOR ACTUATING A VEHICLE BRAKE SYSTEM OF A VEHICLE, AND TOWING VEHICLE | [2024/06] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR ACTIONNER UN SYSTÈME DE FREINAGE DE VÉHICULE D'UN VÉHICULE, ET VÉHICULE DE REMORQUAGE | [2024/06] | Entry into regional phase | 26.07.2023 | National basic fee paid | 26.07.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.07.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.07.2023 | Examination requested [2024/06] | 26.07.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAY]US5986544 (KAISERS OLAF [DE], et al) [X] 1,4-6,10,13,18-20 * figure 1; claims 1-14 * [A] 7-9,14,15 [Y] 2,3,11,12; | [XA]EP3266661 (PAUL FORRER AG [CH]) [X] 1,16,17,20 * claims 1-17 * [A] 7-9,14,15; | [YA]US2019084537 (KASPER PHILLIP J [US], et al) [Y] 2,3,11,12 * paragraph [0133] - paragraph [0134] *[A] 1,7-9,14,15 |