EP4305315 - MANUFACTURE OF AN IMPELLER IN A HYBRID PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.12.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.09.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 25.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | 17.05.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KSB SE & Co. KGaA Johann-Klein-Straße 9 67227 Frankenthal / DE | [2024/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NOBEL, Tammuz 67227 Frankenthal / DE | [2024/03] | Application number, filing date | 22710383.5 | 04.03.2022 | [2024/03] | WO2022EP55537 | Priority number, date | DE202110105610 | 09.03.2021 Original published format: DE102021105610 | [2024/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022189286 | Date: | 15.09.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4305315 | Date: | 17.01.2024 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.09.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F04D29/22 | [2024/03] | CPC: |
F04D29/2222 (EP);
F04D29/22 (US);
B33Y80/00 (US);
F04D1/00 (US);
F04D1/06 (US);
F04D17/00 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/03] | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNG EINES LAUFRADES IN EINEM HYBRIDVERFAHREN | [2024/03] | English: | MANUFACTURE OF AN IMPELLER IN A HYBRID PROCESS | [2024/03] | French: | FABRICATION D'UNE ROUE À AUBES DANS UN PROCÉDÉ HYBRIDE | [2024/03] | Entry into regional phase | 24.08.2023 | National basic fee paid | 24.08.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.08.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.08.2023 | Examination requested [2024/03] | 24.08.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2015017013 (TOZZI PIERLUIGI [IT], et al) [A] 1-16* abstract *; | [XI]US2017260997 (MOLA PAOLO [IT], et al) [X] 1-10,15,16 * paragraphs [0011] , [0 59] - [0062] - [0 90]; figures 1-22 * * abstract * [I] 11-14; | [X]US2019313878 (DRIES JOHN EDWARD [US]) [X] 1,2,5-8,15,16 * paragraph [0058] - paragraph [0064]; figures 5-8 * * abstract * | by applicant | DE102015202417 | DE102016225018 |