EP4307966 - POSTURAL SITTING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.12.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.09.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 26.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | 17.05.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Grosso, Raffaele Via Panoramica Fellapane 3 80040 San Sebastiano al Vesuvio (NA) / IT | [2024/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2024/04] | Representative(s) | Mincone, Antimo Viale Europa 101 50126 Firenze / IT | [2024/04] | Application number, filing date | 22710757.0 | 01.03.2022 | [2024/04] | WO2022IT50040 | Priority number, date | IT20210006167 | 16.03.2021 Original published format: IT202100006167 | [2024/04] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022195636 | Date: | 22.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4307966 | Date: | 24.01.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.09.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A47C7/02, A47C7/50, A47C7/54, A47C1/03, A61G5/10 | [2024/04] | CPC: |
A47C7/024 (EP);
A47C1/0303 (EP);
A47C1/0308 (EP);
A47C7/503 (EP);
A47C7/5064 (EP);
A47C7/5066 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/04] | Title | German: | HALTUNGSSITZSYSTEM | [2024/04] | English: | POSTURAL SITTING SYSTEM | [2024/04] | French: | SYSTÈME DE POSTURE ASSISE | [2024/04] | Entry into regional phase | 17.08.2023 | National basic fee paid | 17.08.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.08.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.08.2023 | Examination requested [2024/04] | 17.08.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]EP1827345 (R82 AS [DK]) [AD] 1-9* figure - *; | [A]US2011156465 (WHITE WILLIAM L [US]) [A] 1-9 * figure - *; | [A]US2017252239 (NADEAU FRÉDÉRIC [CA], et al) [A] 1-9 * figure - * |