EP4298560 - AUTOMATED MACHINE LEARNING TO GENERATE RECOMMENDATIONS FOR WEBSITES OR APPLICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.12.2023 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.09.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 26.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | 03.05.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Amplitude, Inc. 201 3rd Street Suite 200 San Francisco, CA 94103 / US | [2024/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAHMOOD, Muhammad Bilal Palo Alto, California 94303 / US | 02 /
PENTNEY, William Robert San Francisco, California 94110 / US | 03 /
POLLMANN, Eric M Los Altos, California 94022 / US | 04 /
ROGERS, Cynthia E Boston, Massachusetts 02127 / US | 05 /
PAKSOY, Mustafa San Francisco, California 94110 / US | 06 /
MIRANDA, Zachery Abe San Francisco, California 94108 / US | [2024/01] | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Maximiliansplatz 14 80333 München / DE | [2024/01] | Application number, filing date | 22710841.2 | 25.02.2022 | [2024/01] | WO2022US17838 | Priority number, date | US202117187737 | 26.02.2021 Original published format: US202117187737 | [2024/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022182951 | Date: | 01.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4298560 | Date: | 03.01.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.09.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06N3/08 | [2024/01] | CPC: |
G06N3/08 (EP,US);
G06N5/04 (US);
G06F16/9535 (US);
G06N5/02 (US);
G06N20/00 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/01] | Title | German: | AUTOMATISIERTES MASCHINENLERNEN ZUR ERZEUGUNG VON EMPFEHLUNGEN FÜR WEBSITES ODER ANWENDUNGEN | [2024/01] | English: | AUTOMATED MACHINE LEARNING TO GENERATE RECOMMENDATIONS FOR WEBSITES OR APPLICATIONS | [2024/01] | French: | APPRENTISSAGE AUTOMATIQUE AUTOMATISÉ POUR LA GÉNÉRATION DE RECOMMANDATIONS POUR SITES WEB OU APPLICATIONS | [2024/01] | Entry into regional phase | 26.09.2023 | National basic fee paid | 26.09.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.09.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.09.2023 | Examination requested [2024/01] | 26.09.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2018218429 (GUO STEPHEN DEAN [US], et al) |