EP4200224 - INVERTED DISPENSING CONTAINER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.03.2024 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.05.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.09.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 30.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.03.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Colgate-Palmolive Company 300 Park Avenue New York, NY 10022 / US | [2023/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TATU, Francis Sea Girt, New Jersey 08750 / US | 02 /
BALAMUCKI, Brian East Windsor, New Jersey 08520 / US | 03 /
BARTLETT, Mark North East, Pennsylvania 16428 / US | 04 /
PETERS, Daniel Portland, Maine 04101 / US | 05 /
CHEN, Xi Guangzhou, Guangdong 510620 / CN | 06 /
LIANG, Shihui Guangzhou, Guangdong 510620 / CN | [2023/26] | Representative(s) | Schicker, Silvia Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/26] | Schicker, Silvia Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 22711418.8 | 25.02.2022 | [2023/26] | WO2022US70829 | Priority number, date | US202117194741 | 08.03.2021 Original published format: US202117194741 | [2023/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022192835 | Date: | 15.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4200224 | Date: | 28.06.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.09.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B65D25/48, B65D47/12 | [2023/26] | CPC: |
B65D25/48 (EP);
B65D35/10 (US);
B65D47/122 (US);
B65D47/123 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/26] | Title | German: | UMGEKEHRTER AUSGABEBEHÄLTER | [2023/26] | English: | INVERTED DISPENSING CONTAINER | [2023/26] | French: | RÉCIPIENT DE DISTRIBUTION INVERSÉ | [2023/26] | Entry into regional phase | 24.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 24.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/26] | 24.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [IA]DE19824714 (ALPLA DESIGN LEHNER GMBH [DE]) [I] 1-12,20 * figures 3-5 * [A] 13-19; | [IA]WO2008011966 (ALPLA WERKE [AT], et al) [I] 1-12,20 * page 9, line 19 - page 10, line 15; figures 1-12 *[A] 13-19; | [IA]WO2015002110 (ROHTO PHARMA [JP]) [I] 1-12,20 * figures 1-10 * [A] 13-19 | by applicant | US8940361 |