EP4291726 - ANCHOR FOR ABSORBING FORCES AND/OR TRANSFERRING FORCES INTO A SUBSOIL, YARD WARE AND INSERTION AND FASTENING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.11.2023 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.08.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 30.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | 19.04.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ITA Technologietransfer GmbH Otto-Blumenthal-Strasse 1 52074 Aachen / DE | [2023/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FULDE, Gerolda 79111 Freiburg / DE | [2023/51] | Representative(s) | FARAGO Patentanwälte GmbH Schloß-Rahe-Straße 15 52072 Aachen / DE | [2023/51] | Application number, filing date | 22711474.1 | 14.02.2022 | [2023/51] | WO2022DE200018 | Priority number, date | DE20212000550U | 13.02.2021 Original published format: DE 202021000550 U | [2023/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022171253 | Date: | 18.08.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4291726 | Date: | 20.12.2023 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.08.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | E02D5/80, E02D5/66, E02D17/20 | [2023/51] | CPC: |
E02D5/808 (EP);
E02D17/202 (EP);
E02D5/665 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/51] | Title | German: | ANKER ZUR AUFNAHME UND/ODER ÜBERTRAGUNG VON KRÄFTEN IN EINEN UNTERGRUND, METERWARE UND VERFAHREN ZUM EINBRINGEN UND BEFESTIGEN | [2023/51] | English: | ANCHOR FOR ABSORBING FORCES AND/OR TRANSFERRING FORCES INTO A SUBSOIL, YARD WARE AND INSERTION AND FASTENING METHOD | [2023/51] | French: | ANCRE POUR ABSORBER ET/OU TRANSMETTRE DES FORCES DANS UNE STRUCTURE SOUTERRAINE, MARCHANDISE AU MÈTRE ET PROCÉDÉ D'INSERTION ET DE FIXATION | [2023/51] | Entry into regional phase | 13.09.2023 | National basic fee paid | 13.09.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.09.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.09.2023 | Examination requested [2023/51] | 13.09.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |