EP4285374 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR HYBRID VIRTUAL AND CHEMICAL STAINING OF TISSUE SAMPLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.11.2023 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.09.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 30.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | 03.05.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Leica Biosystems Melbourne Pty Ltd 495 Blackburn Road Mt Waverley, VIC 3149 / AU | [2023/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIODUSZEWSKI, Zbigniew Mount Waverley, Victoria 3149 / AU | [2023/49] | Representative(s) | Simmons & Simmons City Point One Ropemaker Street London EC2Y 9SS / GB | [2023/49] | Application number, filing date | 22711707.4 | 07.02.2022 | [2023/49] | WO2022US15517 | Priority number, date | US202163154548P | 26.02.2021 Original published format: US 202163154548 P | [2023/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022182505 | Date: | 01.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4285374 | Date: | 06.12.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.09.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G16H10/40, G16H30/40, G16H50/20 | [2023/49] | CPC: |
G16H30/40 (EP,US);
G01N1/30 (US);
G06T7/0012 (US);
G16H10/40 (EP);
G16H50/20 (EP,US);
G06T2207/20081 (US);
G06T2207/30024 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/49] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR HYBRIDEN VIRTUELLEN UND CHEMISCHEN FÄRBUNG VON GEWEBEPROBEN | [2023/49] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR HYBRID VIRTUAL AND CHEMICAL STAINING OF TISSUE SAMPLES | [2023/49] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE COLORATION HYBRIDE VIRTUELLE ET CHIMIQUE D'ÉCHANTILLONS TISSULAIRES | [2023/49] | Entry into regional phase | 01.09.2023 | National basic fee paid | 01.09.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.09.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.09.2023 | Examination requested [2023/49] | 01.09.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [IY]WO2020198380 (TEMPUS LABS INC [US]) [I] 1-20 * paragraph [0091] - paragraph [0092] * * paragraph [0112] - paragraph [0113] * * paragraph [0117] * [Y] 1-20; | [I]WO2021001831 (NUCLEAI LTD [IL]) [I] 1-20 * paragraph [0088] ** paragraph [0105] - paragraph [0106] *; | [Y] - RIVENSON YAIR ET AL, "Virtual histological staining of unlabelled tissue-autofluorescence images via deep learning", NATURE BIOMEDICAL ENGINEERING, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP UK, LONDON, (20190304), vol. 3, no. 6, doi:10.1038/S41551-019-0362-Y, pages 466 - 477, XP036799479 [Y] 1-20 * page 740 * * figures 2, 3 * * table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/s41551-019-0362-y |