EP4301758 - SYNTHETIC METHODS AND INTERMEDIATES FOR PRODUCING COMPOUNDS FOR TREATING KIT- AND PDGFRA-MEDIATED DISEASES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.12.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.09.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 30.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | 10.05.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Blueprint Medicines Corporation 45 Sidney Street Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | [2024/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Christopher Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | 02 /
LI, Hui Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | 03 /
DIKER, Khalid 60340 Saint Leu d'Esserent / FR | 04 /
TOURNADE, Baptiste 60340 Saint Leu d'Esserent / FR | 05 /
CAILLOT, Gilles 60340 Saint Leu d'Esserent / FR | 06 /
WAGNER, Andreas 5605 Dottikon / CH | 07 /
HEINRICH, Brian Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | [2024/02] | Representative(s) | Haile, Alison Victoria, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [2024/02] | Application number, filing date | 22711793.4 | 03.03.2022 | [2024/02] | WO2022US18692 | Priority number, date | US202163155947P | 03.03.2021 Original published format: US 202163155947 P | [2024/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022187477 | Date: | 09.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4301758 | Date: | 10.01.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.09.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C07D487/04 | [2024/02] | CPC: |
C07D487/04 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/53 (KR);
Y02P20/55 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/02] | Title | German: | SYNTHETISCHE VERFAHREN UND ZWISCHENPRODUKTE ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON VERBINDUNGEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON KIT- UND PDGFRA-VERMITTELTEN ERKRANKUNGEN | [2024/02] | English: | SYNTHETIC METHODS AND INTERMEDIATES FOR PRODUCING COMPOUNDS FOR TREATING KIT- AND PDGFRA-MEDIATED DISEASES | [2024/02] | French: | PROCÉDÉS SYNTHÉTIQUES ET INTERMÉDIAIRES POUR LA PRODUCTION DE COMPOSÉS POUR TRAITER DES MALADIES MÉDIÉES PAR KIT ET PDGFRA | [2024/02] | Entry into regional phase | 28.09.2023 | National basic fee paid | 28.09.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.09.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.09.2023 | Examination requested [2024/02] | 28.09.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [IDY]WO2020210293 (BLUEPRINT MEDICINES CORP [US]); | by applicant | WO2020210293 | WO2020210669 | US10829493 |