EP4304539 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR GENERATING PATIENT-SPECIFIC CORNEAL CROSS-LINKING TREATMENT PATTERNS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.12.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.09.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 02.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | 10.05.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Avedro, Inc. 201 Jones Road Waltham, MA 02451 / US | [2024/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
USHER, David Waltham, MA 01845 / US | 02 /
SMIRNOV, Mikhail Andover, MA 01845 / US | 03 /
TAVAKOL, Bhrouz Lexington, MA 02420 / US | 04 /
LYTLE, Grace, Elizabeth Bedford, MA 01730 / US | [2024/03] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2024/03] | Application number, filing date | 22712202.5 | 08.03.2022 | [2024/03] | WO2022US19314 | Priority number, date | US202163158023P | 08.03.2021 Original published format: US 202163158023 P | [2024/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022192237 | Date: | 15.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4304539 | Date: | 17.01.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.09.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61F9/007, A61F9/008 | [2024/03] | CPC: |
A61F9/0079 (EP);
G06T7/0012 (US);
A61B3/102 (US);
A61F9/008 (EP);
A61F2009/00893 (EP);
A61P27/02 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/03] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR ERZEUGUNG PATIENTENSPEZIFISCHER HORNHAUTVERNETZUNGSBEHANDLUNGSMUSTER | [2024/03] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR GENERATING PATIENT-SPECIFIC CORNEAL CROSS-LINKING TREATMENT PATTERNS | [2024/03] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET MÉTHODES DE GÉNÉRATION DE SCHÉMAS DE TRAITEMENT DE CROSS LINKING DU COLLAGÈNE CORNÉEN SPÉCIFIQUES AU PATIENT | [2024/03] | Entry into regional phase | 11.09.2023 | National basic fee paid | 11.09.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.09.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.09.2023 | Examination requested [2024/03] | 11.09.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]CN110559087 (GRADUATE SCHOOL SHENZHEN TSINGHUA UNIV) [A] 1-20* claim 1 *; | [XI]US2020085617 (RAJPAL RAJESH K [US], et al) [X] 1-15,18,19 * paragraphs [0013] - [0018] - [0031] - [0034]; figures 1,2 * [I] 16,17,20 | by applicant | US2011237999 | US2012215155 | US2013060187 | US2013245536 | US8574277 | US2016310319 | US2017156926 | US2017296383 | US2020107953 |