EP4314219 - FABRIC CARE FORMULATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.09.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 05.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | 24.05.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dow Global Technologies LLC 2211 H.H. Dow Way Midland, MI 48674 / US | For all designated states Dow Silicones Corporation 2200 West Salzburg Road Midland, Michigan 48686 / US | For all designated states Rohm and Haas Company 400 Arcola Road Collegeville, PA 19426 / US | [2024/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SIKARSKIE, Michelle Auburn, Michigan 48686-0994 / US | 02 /
PULUKKODY, Randara Collegeville, Pennsylvania 19426 / US | 03 /
BAUER, Paula Auburn, Michigan 48686-0994 / US | 04 /
LEAL, Lyndsay M. Collegeville, Pennsylvania 19426 / US | 05 /
PARTAIN, Emmett M. Bound Brook, New Jersey 08805 / US | 06 /
MILLER, Daniel S. Collegeville, Pennsylvania 19426 / US | 07 /
TODD, Jennifer P. Collegeville, Pennsylvania 19426 / US | [2024/06] | Representative(s) | Beck Greener LLP Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [2024/06] | Application number, filing date | 22712760.2 | 09.03.2022 | [2024/06] | WO2022US19473 | Priority number, date | US202163164610P | 23.03.2021 Original published format: US 202163164610 P | [2024/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022203868 | Date: | 29.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4314219 | Date: | 07.02.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.09.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C11D1/62, C11D3/37, C11D11/00 | [2024/06] | CPC: |
C11D1/62 (EP);
C11D1/831 (US);
C11D1/22 (US);
C11D1/29 (US);
C11D3/222 (US);
C11D3/3788 (EP);
C11D2111/12 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/06] | Title | German: | STOFFPFLEGEFORMULIERUNG | [2024/06] | English: | FABRIC CARE FORMULATION | [2024/06] | French: | FORMULATION DE SOIN DES TISSUS | [2024/06] | Entry into regional phase | 03.10.2023 | National basic fee paid | 03.10.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.10.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.10.2023 | Examination requested [2024/06] | 03.10.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [IY]US4308024 (WELLS MARTIN A) [I] 1-6,10 * examples 1, 34 * * column 4, line 65 * [Y] 7-9; | [A]WO2016160738 (DU PONT [US]) [A] 1-10; | [Y]US10604723 (ELDREDGE JOSEPHINE [US], et al) [Y] 7-9* table in column 21 *; | [T] - Weston Charles W. ET AL, "AMMONIUM COMPOUNDS", KIRK-OTHMER ENCYCLOPEDIA OF CHEMICAL TECHNOLOGY (4th edition), Hoboken, NJ, USA, Wiley-Interscience, (20030620), pages 1 - 52, doi:10.1002/0471238961, ISBN 978-0-471-48494-3, XP055923399 [T] 1-10 * section "11.9 Uses" * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/0471238961 | [T] - MISHRA S ET AL, "Ester Quats: The Novel Class of Cationic Fabric Softeners"", JOURNAL OF OLEO SCIENCE, JAPAN OIL CHEMISTS SOCIETY, TOKYO, JP, (20070101), vol. 56, no. 6, ISSN 1345-8957, pages 269 - 276, XP002526224 [T] 1-10 * abstract * | by applicant | US6833347 | US2017335242 | - J. P. SIBILIA, A Guide to Materials Characterization and Chemical Analysis, VCH, (19880000), pages 81 - 84 |