EP4304497 - DEVICE FOR MODIFYING AND/OR REMOVING OBSTRUCTIVE MATERIAL FROM A LUMEN OF A BLOOD VESSEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.12.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.09.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | 17.05.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intervene, Inc. 415 Grand Avenue Suite 302 South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | [2024/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GARRISON, Michi, E. San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | 02 /
DELL, Kent, D. San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | 03 /
ELKINS, Jeffrey, M. San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | 04 /
LAGOE, Daniel, T. San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | 05 /
MENDOZA, Herbert, M. San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | [2024/03] | Representative(s) | Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Straße 11 80636 München / DE | [2024/03] | Application number, filing date | 22713837.7 | 10.03.2022 | [2024/03] | WO2022US71076 | Priority number, date | US202163200495P | 10.03.2021 Original published format: US 202163200495 P | [2024/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022192897 | Date: | 15.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4304497 | Date: | 17.01.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.09.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/221, A61B17/3207, A61F2/01, A61B17/00 | [2024/03] | CPC: |
A61B17/221 (EP);
A61F2/013 (EP,US);
A61B17/320725 (EP,US);
A61F2/0105 (US);
A61B2017/00867 (EP);
A61B2017/2212 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/03] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR MODIFIZIERUNG UND/ODER ENTFERNUNG VON OBSTRUKTIVEM MATERIAL AUS EINEM LUMEN EINES BLUTGEFÄSSES | [2024/03] | English: | DEVICE FOR MODIFYING AND/OR REMOVING OBSTRUCTIVE MATERIAL FROM A LUMEN OF A BLOOD VESSEL | [2024/03] | French: | DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE MODIFIER ET/OU D'ÉLIMINER UN MATÉRIAU OBSTRUCTIF DE LA LUMIÈRE D'UN VAISSEAU SANGUIN | [2024/03] | Entry into regional phase | 06.10.2023 | National basic fee paid | 06.10.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.10.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.10.2023 | Examination requested [2024/03] | 06.10.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5224945 (PANNEK JR EDWARD J [US]) [A] 1-20 * abstract * * column 5, line 63 - column 6, line 35 *; | [XAI]US5827324 (CASSELL ROBERT L [US], et al) [X] 1-6,15-17 * abstract * * column 5, line 49 - column 6, line 15 * * column 2, lines 49-67 * [A] 8-14,18-20 [I] 7; | [XYI]US2002010487 (EVANS MICHAEL A [US], et al) [X] 1-6,11,16 * abstract * * paragraphs [0091] , [0017] , [0 20] , [0 52] - [0055] - [0090] - [0092] * [Y] 8-10,12-15,19,20 [I] 7,17,18; | [A]US2014052103 (CULLY EDWARD H [US], et al) [A] 1,17,18* abstract *; | [Y]US2018000509 (WILSON FLETCHER T [US], et al) [Y] 8-10,12-15,19,20 * abstract * * paragraphs [0056] , [0059] - [0060] - [0071] * |