EP4315298 - METHOD AND WARNING DEVICE FOR WARNING A FOLLOWING VEHICLE ON A DEFINED ROADWAY SECTION ABOUT AN OBSTACLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.10.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 13.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | 07.06.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Continental Automotive Technologies GmbH Continental-Plaza 1 30175 Hannover / DE | [2024/17] |
Former [2024/06] | For all designated states Continental Automotive Technologies GmbH Vahrenwalder Straße 9 30165 Hannover / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SENNINGER, Dominik 60488 Frankfurt am Main / DE | 02 /
HAMPERL, Helmut 60488 Frankfurt am Main / DE | 03 /
WAGNER, Matthias 60488 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2024/06] | Representative(s) | Continental Corporation c/o Continental Automotive Technologies GmbH Intellectual Property Guerickestr. 7 60488 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2024/06] | Application number, filing date | 22714359.1 | 18.03.2022 | [2024/06] | WO2022DE200048 | Priority number, date | DE202110203186 | 30.03.2021 Original published format: DE102021203186 | [2024/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022207045 | Date: | 06.10.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4315298 | Date: | 07.02.2024 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.10.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G08G1/01 | [2024/06] | CPC: |
G08G1/164 (EP,KR,US);
G08G1/096775 (EP,KR);
G08G1/0125 (US);
G08G1/096716 (EP,KR);
G08G1/096725 (EP,KR);
G08G1/096758 (EP,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/06] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND WARNVORRICHTUNG ZUM WARNEN EINES NACHFOLGEFAHRZEUGS AUF EINEM DEFINIERTEN FAHRBAHNABSCHNITT VOR EINEM HINDERNIS | [2024/06] | English: | METHOD AND WARNING DEVICE FOR WARNING A FOLLOWING VEHICLE ON A DEFINED ROADWAY SECTION ABOUT AN OBSTACLE | [2024/06] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF D'AVERTISSEMENT POUR AVERTIR UN VÉHICULE SUIVEUR SUR UNE SECTION DE CHAUSSÉE DÉFINIE À PROPOS D'UN OBSTACLE | [2024/06] | Entry into regional phase | 30.10.2023 | National basic fee paid | 30.10.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.10.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.10.2023 | Examination requested [2024/06] | 30.10.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |