EP4305838 - WEB-BASED VIDEO CONFERENCING SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.12.2023 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.09.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 13.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | 17.05.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ati Studios A.p.p.s. S.r.l. 50A Grivitei Boulevard Bloc 15, Entrance C, First Floor Room 1 500182 Brasov / RO | [2024/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ILIESCU, Alexandru 500085 Brasov / RO | 02 /
ILIESCU, Tudor 500009 Brasov / RO | [2024/03] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2024/03] | Application number, filing date | 22714390.6 | 11.03.2022 | [2024/03] | WO2022EP56352 | Priority number, date | US202163159679P | 11.03.2021 Original published format: US 202163159679 P | [2024/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2022189638 | Date: | 15.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/37] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4305838 | Date: | 17.01.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.09.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/15 | [2024/03] | CPC: |
H04N7/157 (EP);
H04L65/403 (US);
H04N5/2628 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/03] | Title | German: | WEB-BASIERTES VIDEOKONFERENZSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN | [2024/03] | English: | WEB-BASED VIDEO CONFERENCING SYSTEM AND METHOD | [2024/03] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE VIDÉOCONFÉRENCE À BASE DE WEB | [2024/03] | Entry into regional phase | 10.10.2023 | National basic fee paid | 10.10.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.10.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.10.2023 | Examination requested [2024/03] | 10.10.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2011025819 (GORZYNSKI MARK E [US], et al) [A] 1-3,12-20 * paragraph [0064] * * paragraph [0059] *; | [A]US2015312520 (NOHRIA NITIN [US], et al) [A] 1-3,12-20 * paragraph [0060] *; | [A]US9381426 (HUGHES CHARLES E [US], et al) [A] 1-3,12-20 * column 16, line 39 - column 19, line 24 *; | [A]US2018122254 (RANGAN P VENKAT [IN], et al) [A] 1-3,12-20 * paragraph [0124] *; | [A]US2020294317 (SEGAL EDO [US]) [A] 1-3,12-20* abstract *; | [XA]US2020322395 (COPLEY DEVON [US], et al) [X] 1,2,12-15,18 * paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0069] - paragraph [0070] * [A] 3,16,17,19,20; | [XI]US2020349751 (BENTOVIM LYRON L [US], et al) [X] 1-3,12,13,15-20 * the whole document * [I] 14 |