EP4327116 - DISTRIBUTING RECEIVE CHAINS FOR PARALLEL PROCESSING OF REFERENCE SIGNALS FROM MULTIPLE SOURCES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.01.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.10.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 13.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM INCORPORATED ATTN: International IP Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2024/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MANOLAKOS, Alexandros San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
KUMAR, Mukesh San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | 03 /
OPSHAUG, Guttorm Ringstad San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2024/09] | Representative(s) | Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2024/09] | Howe, Steven Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | Application number, filing date | 22714740.2 | 08.03.2022 | [2024/09] | WO2022US71039 | Priority number, date | GR20210100284 | 21.04.2021 Original published format: GR 20210100284 | [2024/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022226445 | Date: | 27.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4327116 | Date: | 28.02.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.10.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01S5/02, G01S5/00 | [2024/09] | CPC: |
G01S5/0036 (EP,KR);
G01S5/0268 (US);
G01S5/0221 (US);
G01S5/0244 (EP,KR);
H04W64/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/09] | Title | German: | VERTEILUNG VON EMPFANGSKETTEN ZUR PARALLELEN VERARBEITUNG VON REFERENZSIGNALEN AUS MEHREREN QUELLEN | [2024/09] | English: | DISTRIBUTING RECEIVE CHAINS FOR PARALLEL PROCESSING OF REFERENCE SIGNALS FROM MULTIPLE SOURCES | [2024/09] | French: | DISTRIBUTION DE CHAÎNES DE RÉCEPTION POUR TRAITEMENT PARALLÈLE DE SIGNAUX DE RÉFÉRENCE À PARTIR DE SOURCES MULTIPLES | [2024/09] | Entry into regional phase | 15.08.2023 | National basic fee paid | 15.08.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.08.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.08.2023 | Examination requested [2024/09] | 15.08.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Divisional application(s) | EP24172692.6 / EP4382946 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAI]WO2016191126 (QUALCOMM INC [US]); | [XAI]WO2018190972 (QUALCOMM INC [US]); | [XAI]WO2019060493 (QUALCOMM INC [US]); | [A]WO2019212859 (QUALCOMM INC [US]); | [A]US2020059888 (CUI JIE [US], et al) |