EP4323226 - CONTROL UNIT FOR CONTROLLING A FLOW OF ELECTRICAL ENERGY BETWEEN ONE OR MORE ELECTRICAL ENERGY REPOSITORIES AND A POWER GRID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.01.2024 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.10.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 25.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Scania CV AB 151 87 Södertälje / SE | [2024/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YIN, Lianhao 112 33 Stockholm / SE | [2024/08] | Representative(s) | Scania CV AB Patents, GP 117kv 151 87 Södertälje / SE | [2024/08] | Application number, filing date | 22716575.0 | 05.04.2022 | [2024/08] | WO2022SE50333 | Priority number, date | SE20210050462 | 15.04.2021 Original published format: SE 2150462 | [2024/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022220720 | Date: | 20.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4323226 | Date: | 21.02.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.10.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B60L53/64, B60L55/00, H02J3/32 | [2024/08] | CPC: |
H02J3/322 (EP);
B60L3/12 (EP);
B60L53/63 (EP);
B60L55/00 (EP);
B60L2200/18 (EP);
B60L2240/68 (EP);
B60L2240/70 (EP);
B60L2250/18 (EP);
B60L2260/46 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/08] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STEUEREINHEIT ZUR STEUERUNG EINES ELEKTRISCHEN ENERGIEFLUSSES ZWISCHEN EINEM ODER MEHREREN ELEKTRISCHEN ENERGIESPEICHERN UND EINEM STROMNETZ | [2024/08] | English: | CONTROL UNIT FOR CONTROLLING A FLOW OF ELECTRICAL ENERGY BETWEEN ONE OR MORE ELECTRICAL ENERGY REPOSITORIES AND A POWER GRID | [2024/08] | French: | UNITÉ DE COMMANDE POUR RÉGULER UN FLUX D'ÉNERGIE ÉLECTRIQUE ENTRE UN OU PLUSIEURS RÉFÉRENTIELS D'ÉNERGIE ÉLECTRIQUE ET UN RÉSEAU ÉLECTRIQUE | [2024/08] | Entry into regional phase | 15.11.2023 | National basic fee paid | 15.11.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.11.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.11.2023 | Examination requested [2024/08] | 15.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2019140279 (JOHNSON CONTROLS TECH CO [US]) [X] 1,11,13-17* paragraphs [0003] - [0020] - [0123] , [0138] , [0143] , [0229] - [0287] - [0306] - [0308]; figures 1,10-14,19 *; | [XI]US2020101850 (HARTY RYAN D [US], et al) [X] 1-8,10-12,14,16,17 * paragraphs [0001] - [0003] - [0020] - [0023] - [0032] - [0035] - [0046] - [0052] - [0085] , [0135] - [0140] - [0157] , [0166]; figures 4,5,9 * [I] 9,13,15 |