EP4314638 - LIGHTING DEVICE FOR A FREE VIEWING MODE AND A RESTRICTED VIEWING MODE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.10.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 29.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | 07.06.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sioptica GmbH Moritz-von-Rohr-Strasse 1a 07745 Jena / DE | [2024/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEBER, André 99425 Weimar / DE | 02 /
KLIPPSTEIN, Markus 07751 Jena / DE | [2024/06] | Representative(s) | Gleim Petri Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Neugasse 13 07743 Jena / DE | [2024/06] | Application number, filing date | 22717196.4 | 29.03.2022 | [2024/06] | WO2022EP58264 | Priority number, date | DE202110108112 | 30.03.2021 Original published format: DE102021108112 | [2024/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022207639 | Date: | 06.10.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4314638 | Date: | 07.02.2024 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.10.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F21V8/00, G02F1/13, G02F1/13357 | [2024/06] | CPC: |
G02B6/0035 (EP,KR);
G02B6/0036 (EP,KR,US);
G02B6/0068 (EP,KR,US);
G02B6/0076 (EP,KR);
G02F1/1323 (EP,KR);
G02F1/133603 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/06] | Title | German: | BELEUCHTUNGSEINRICHTUNG FÜR EINEN FREIEN UND EINEN EINGESCHRÄNKTEN SICHTMODUS | [2024/06] | English: | LIGHTING DEVICE FOR A FREE VIEWING MODE AND A RESTRICTED VIEWING MODE | [2024/06] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ÉCLAIRAGE POUR UN MODE DE VISUALISATION LIBRE ET UN MODE DE VISUALISATION RESTREINTE | [2024/06] | Entry into regional phase | 22.08.2023 | National basic fee paid | 22.08.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.08.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.08.2023 | Examination requested [2024/06] | 22.08.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2017065745 (HEWLETT PACKARD DEVELOPMENT CO LP [US]); | [X]US2017261672 (LIU KUAN-WEN [TW], et al); | [XAI]CN108983447 (INNOLUX CORP) | by applicant | US5956107 | US2007008456 | US2007030240 | CN1987606 | WO2015121398 | WO2017089482 | CN107734118 | US2018267344 | US2020012129 |