EP4326549 - METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A GLAZING UNIT WITH ELECTRICALLY CONTROLLABLE OPTICAL PROPERTIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.01.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.10.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 29.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | 20.06.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Saint-Gobain Glass France Tour Saint-Gobain 12 Place de l'Iris 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [2024/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STELZER, Richard 40547 Düsseldorf / DE | 02 /
KLAUSS, Bastian 47906 Kempen / DE | 03 /
CRAIG, Doane Shelby 52134 Herzogenrath / DE | [2024/09] | Representative(s) | Weber, Sophie Saint-Gobain Sekurit Deutschland GmbH SGR-Germany, Patentabteilung Glasstraße 1 52134 Herzogenrath / DE | [2024/09] | Application number, filing date | 22717213.7 | 13.04.2022 | [2024/09] | WO2022EP59916 | Priority number, date | EP20210169057 | 19.04.2021 Original published format: EP 21169057 | EP20210183018 | 01.07.2021 Original published format: EP 21183018 | [2024/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022223409 | Date: | 27.10.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4326549 | Date: | 28.02.2024 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.10.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B32B17/10, B32B3/08 | [2024/09] | CPC: |
B32B3/08 (EP,KR);
B32B17/10467 (KR);
E06B9/24 (US);
B32B17/10036 (EP,KR);
B32B17/1011 (EP,KR);
B32B17/10192 (EP,KR);
B32B17/10211 (EP,KR);
B32B17/1022 (EP,KR);
B32B17/10302 (EP,KR);
B32B17/10348 (EP,KR);
B32B17/10504 (EP,KR);
B32B17/10513 (EP,KR);
B32B17/10532 (EP,KR);
B32B17/10761 (EP,KR);
B32B17/1077 (EP,KR);
B32B17/10788 (EP,KR);
B32B27/08 (EP);
B32B27/30 (EP);
B32B27/306 (EP);
B32B27/36 (EP);
B32B27/40 (EP);
B32B3/02 (EP);
B32B7/12 (EP,KR);
B60J3/04 (US);
G02F1/0123 (US);
B32B2250/40 (EP);
B32B2255/10 (EP);
B32B2255/20 (EP);
B32B2255/205 (EP);
B32B2307/202 (EP);
B32B2307/4023 (EP);
B32B2307/4026 (EP);
B32B2307/41 (EP);
B32B2307/412 (EP);
B32B2307/414 (EP);
B32B2457/20 (KR);
| C-Set: |
B32B17/10005, B32B2367/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/09] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG EINER VERGLASUNGSEINHEIT MIT ELEKTRISCH STEUERBAREN OPTISCHEN EIGENSCHAFTEN | [2024/09] | English: | METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A GLAZING UNIT WITH ELECTRICALLY CONTROLLABLE OPTICAL PROPERTIES | [2024/09] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE D'UNE UNITÉ DE VITRAGE À PROPRIÉTÉS OPTIQUES POUVANT ÊTRE COMMANDÉES ÉLECTRIQUEMENT | [2024/09] | Entry into regional phase | 15.08.2023 | National basic fee paid | 15.08.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.08.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.08.2023 | Examination requested [2024/09] | 15.08.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XDI]WO2019011891 (SAINT GOBAIN [FR]) [XD] 9-11,13,14 * page 2, line 6 - line 33 * * page 4, line 1 - page 5, line 25 * * page 20, line 9 - page 21, line 19 * * page 5, line 27 - page 16, line 10 * [I] 1-8,12; | [A] - LEE JUCHAN ET AL, "Power Electronic Converter Topology with Regulable Transmittance of PDLC Applications", 2018 21ST INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ELECTRICAL MACHINES AND SYSTEMS (ICEMS), KIEE EMECS (KIEE ELECTRICAL MACHINERY AND ENERGY CONVERSION SYSTEMS), (20181007), doi:10.23919/ICEMS.2018.8549329, pages 2347 - 2350, XP033451768 [A] 1-8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.23919/ICEMS.2018.8549329 | by applicant | EP0876608 | WO2011033313 | WO2012007334 | US2012026573 | WO2019011891 |