EP4334744 - GENERATING INDOOR MAPS BASED ON RADIO FREQUENCY SENSING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.02.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.11.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 30.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM INCORPORATED ATTN: International IP Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2024/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GIVEHCHIAN, Hadi San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
ZHANG, Xiaoxin San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 03 /
SIYARI, Peyman San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2024/11] | Representative(s) | Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2024/11] | Howe, Steven Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | Application number, filing date | 22717696.3 | 25.03.2022 | [2024/11] | WO2022US21902 | Priority number, date | US202117315128 | 07.05.2021 Original published format: US202117315128 | [2024/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022235347 | Date: | 10.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4334744 | Date: | 13.03.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.11.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01S13/00, G01S13/42, G01S13/87 | [2024/11] | CPC: |
G01S7/006 (EP,KR);
G01S5/02526 (KR,US);
G01S13/003 (EP,KR);
G01S13/42 (EP,KR);
G01S13/878 (EP,KR);
G01S5/02527 (KR,US);
H04W4/029 (KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/11] | Title | German: | ERZEUGUNG VON INNENRAUMKARTEN AUF BASIS VON FUNKFREQUENZERFASSUNG | [2024/11] | English: | GENERATING INDOOR MAPS BASED ON RADIO FREQUENCY SENSING | [2024/11] | French: | GÉNÉRATION DE CARTES INTÉRIEURES SUR LA BASE D'UNE DÉTECTION DE FRÉQUENCE RADIO | [2024/11] | Entry into regional phase | 06.09.2023 | National basic fee paid | 06.09.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.09.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.09.2023 | Examination requested [2024/11] | 06.09.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]WO2018160141 (UNIV NANYANG TECH [SG]) [Y] 11,24,29 * paragraph [0093]; figure 2a; claim 1 *[A] 1-10,12-23,25-28,30; | [XAI]US10361887 (BHATTI JAHSHAN A [US], et al) [X] 1-4,17,18,25-27,30 * figure 1 * [A] 5-7,10,11,23,24 [I] 8,9,12-16,19-22,28,29; | [XYI] - Ahmed Afaz Uddin ET AL, "Estimating Angle-of-Arrival and Time-of-Flight for Multipath Components Using WiFi Channel State Information", Sensors (Basel, Switzerland), Switzerland, doi:10.3390/s18061753, (20180529), page 1753, URL: https://www.ncbi.nlm.nih.gov/pmc/articles/PMC6021904/pdf/sensors-18-01753.pdf, (20211117), XP055862408 [X] 1-7,10,12-20,25-27,30 * abstract * [Y] 11,24,29 [I] 8,9,21,22,28 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3390/s18061753 |