EP4294783 - HYDROGENATION OF DIENALS OR DIENONES WITH RHODIUM COMPLEXES UNDER CARBON MONOXIDE FREE ATMOSPHERE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.11.2023 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.10.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 03.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | 20.06.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Firmenich SA 7, Rue de la Bergère 1242 Satigny / CH | [2023/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAUDAN, Lionel 1242 Satigny / CH | 02 /
QUINTAINE, Julie 1242 Satigny / CH | [2023/52] | Representative(s) | Strych, Sebastian Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [2023/52] | Application number, filing date | 22718233.4 | 12.04.2022 | [2023/52] | WO2022EP59703 | Priority number, date | EP20210169049 | 19.04.2021 Original published format: EP 21169049 | [2023/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022223363 | Date: | 27.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4294783 | Date: | 27.12.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.10.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C07C45/62, C07C49/217, C07C49/203, C07C49/21, C07C49/223, C07C47/232 | [2023/52] | CPC: |
C07C49/217 (EP);
C07C45/62 (EP,US);
B01J31/1616 (US);
B01J31/2495 (US);
C07C47/232 (EP);
C07C49/203 (EP);
C07C49/21 (EP);
C07C49/223 (EP);
B01J2231/643 (US);
C07C2531/24 (EP);
C07C2601/08 (EP);
C07C2601/10 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C07C45/62, C07C47/232 (EP);
C07C45/62, C07C49/203 (EP);
C07C45/62, C07C49/21 (EP);
C07C45/62, C07C49/217 (EP); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/52] | Title | German: | HYDRIERUNG VON DIENALEN ODER DIENONEN MIT RHODIUMKOMPLEXEN UNTER KOHLENMONOXIDFREIER ATMOSPHÄRE | [2023/52] | English: | HYDROGENATION OF DIENALS OR DIENONES WITH RHODIUM COMPLEXES UNDER CARBON MONOXIDE FREE ATMOSPHERE | [2023/52] | French: | HYDROGÉNATION DE DIÉNALS OU DE DIÉNONES AVEC DES COMPLEXES DE RHODIUM SOUS ATMOSPHÈRE EXEMPTE DE MONOXYDE DE CARBONE | [2023/52] | Entry into regional phase | 22.09.2023 | National basic fee paid | 22.09.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.09.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.09.2023 | Examination requested [2023/52] | 22.09.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XDA]WO2012150053 (FIRMENICH & CIE [CH], et al) | by applicant | WO2012150053 |