EP4261997 - BATTERY, ELECTRIC DEVICE, AND BATTERY PREPARATION METHOD AND DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.09.2023 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.08.2023 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 10.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.01.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 10.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Contemporary Amperex Technology Co., Limited No. 2, Xingang Road, Zhangwan Town Jiaocheng District Ningde Fujian 352100 / CN | [2023/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUN, Zhanyu Ningde, Fujian 352100 / CN | 02 /
LONG, Chao Ningde, Fujian 352100 / CN | 03 /
WANG, Peng Ningde, Fujian 352100 / CN | 04 /
CHEN, Xingdi Ningde, Fujian 352100 / CN | [2023/42] | Representative(s) | Herrero & Asociados, S.L. Edificio Aqua - Agustín de Foxá, 4-10 28036 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2023/42] | Herrero & Asociados, S.L. Cedaceros, 1 28014 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 22719768.8 | 21.02.2022 | [2023/42] | WO2022CN77152 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023155211 | Date: | 24.08.2023 | Language: | ZH | [2023/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4261997 | Date: | 18.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 24.08.2023 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H01M50/244, H01M10/625, H01M10/653, H01M50/209, H01M50/233, H01M50/249, H01M50/291, H01M50/293, H01M50/40 | [2023/42] | CPC: |
H01M50/244 (EP);
H01M50/209 (EP,KR);
H01M50/293 (EP,US);
H01M10/625 (EP);
H01M10/647 (EP);
H01M10/653 (EP);
H01M10/658 (EP);
H01M50/233 (EP,KR);
H01M50/24 (KR);
H01M50/242 (KR);
H01M50/249 (EP,KR);
H01M50/289 (EP);
H01M50/291 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/40 (EP);
H01M50/593 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/42] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BATTERIE, STROMVERBRAUCHSVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER BATTERIE | [2023/42] | English: | BATTERY, ELECTRIC DEVICE, AND BATTERY PREPARATION METHOD AND DEVICE | [2023/42] | French: | BATTERIE, DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE PRÉPARATION DE BATTERIE | [2023/42] | Entry into regional phase | 10.05.2022 | Translation filed | 10.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 10.05.2022 | Search fee paid | 10.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.05.2022 | Examination requested [2023/42] | 10.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]CN110993845 (BYD CO LTD) [A] 1-16; | [X]CN111009629 (BYD CO LTD) [X] 1-16 * 0053-0151 1-15 *; | [A]CN112072008 (NINGDE CONTEMPORARY AMPEREX TECH CO LTD)[A] 1-16 | by applicant | GB20200038031 |