EP4314707 - CONFIGURATION METHOD FOR THE DISPLAY OF A BUILDING INFORMATION MODEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.10.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 10.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | 07.06.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states XYZ Reality Limited Unit G0.G02, 338-346 Goswell Road Angel Clerkenwell Greater London, London EC1V 7LQ / GB | [2024/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AHMED, Umar London Greater London EC1V 7LQ / GB | 02 /
MITCHELL, David London Greater London EC1V 7LQ / GB | [2024/06] | Representative(s) | Hoyle, Benjamin James Hoyle IP Services Limited 38 Newbridge Road Bath BA1 3JZ / GB | [2024/06] | Application number, filing date | 22719838.9 | 30.03.2022 | [2024/06] | WO2022EP58383 | Priority number, date | GB20210004720 | 01.04.2021 Original published format: GB 202104720 | [2024/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2022207687 | Date: | 06.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/40] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4314707 | Date: | 07.02.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.10.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01C15/00, G01C15/06, G06F3/01 | [2024/06] | CPC: |
G01C15/002 (EP);
G06T7/74 (GB);
G01C15/06 (EP);
G02B27/017 (EP);
G06F3/012 (EP);
G06F3/013 (EP);
G06T19/006 (GB);
G06T7/248 (GB);
G06T7/33 (EP);
G06T7/73 (EP);
G02B2027/0138 (EP);
G02B2027/014 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/06] | Title | German: | KONFIGURATIONSVERFAHREN ZUR ANZEIGE EINES GEBÄUDEINFORMATIONSMODELLS | [2024/06] | English: | CONFIGURATION METHOD FOR THE DISPLAY OF A BUILDING INFORMATION MODEL | [2024/06] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE CONFIGURATION POUR L'AFFICHAGE D'UNE MODÉLISATION DES DONNÉES DU BÂTIMENT | [2024/06] | Entry into regional phase | 13.10.2023 | National basic fee paid | 13.10.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.10.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.10.2023 | Examination requested [2024/06] | 13.10.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2016292918 (CUMMINGS TIMOTHY A [US], et al); | [Y]US2017337743 (METZLER BERNHARD [AT], et al); | by applicant | US2013235169 | US2016292918 | US9754415 | WO2019048866 | EP3679321 |