EP4349080 - TRANSMISSION CONFIGURATION INDICATOR STATE MODE SWITCHING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.03.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.12.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 10.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | 02.08.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM INCORPORATED ATTN: International IP Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2024/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAI, Tianyang San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
ZHOU, Yan San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 03 /
LUO, Tao San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 04 /
LI, Junyi San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2024/15] | Representative(s) | Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [2024/15] | Application number, filing date | 22720217.3 | 12.04.2022 | [2024/15] | WO2022US24469 | Priority number, date | US202163195526P | 01.06.2021 Original published format: US 202163195526 P | US202217718229 | 11.04.2022 Original published format: US202217718229 | [2024/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022256085 | Date: | 08.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4349080 | Date: | 10.04.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.12.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04W52/34, H04W72/04, H04W72/12, H04L5/00, H04B7/06 | [2024/15] | CPC: |
H04W52/346 (EP);
H04L5/0094 (EP);
H04B7/0695 (EP);
H04L5/001 (EP);
H04L5/0048 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/15] | Title | German: | ZUSTANDSMODUSUMSCHALTUNG FÜR EINEN ÜBERTRAGUNGSKONFIGURATIONSINDIKATOR | [2024/15] | English: | TRANSMISSION CONFIGURATION INDICATOR STATE MODE SWITCHING | [2024/15] | French: | COMMUTATION DE MODE D'ÉTAT D'INDICATEUR DE CONFIGURATION DE TRANSMISSION | [2024/15] | Entry into regional phase | 22.09.2023 | National basic fee paid | 22.09.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.09.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.09.2023 | Examination requested [2024/15] | 22.09.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X] - MODERATOR (SAMSUNG), "Moderator summary for multi-beam enhancement", vol. RAN WG1, no. e-Meeting; 20210510 - 20210527, (20210520), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-2105290, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: https://ftp.3gpp.org/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_105-e/Inbox/R1-2105290.zip R1-2105290 FeMIMO Item 1 Round 0 - final.docx, (20210520), XP052012814 [X] 1-11 * pages 2,8,25 * * table 5 * | [X] - FUTUREWEI, "Enhancement on multi-beam operation", vol. RAN WG1, no. e-Meeting; 20210519 - 20210527, (20210511), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-2104205, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: https://ftp.3gpp.org/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_105-e/Docs/R1-2104205.zip R1-2104205.docx, (20210511), XP052006076 [X] 1-11 * Sections 2.2, 2.3 * | [X] - SONY, "Further enhancement on multi-beam operation", vol. RAN WG1, no. E-meeting; 20210510 - 20210527, (20210512), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-2105151, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: https://ftp.3gpp.org/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_105-e/Docs/R1-2105151.zip R1-2105151.docx, (20210512), XP052011230 [X] 1-11 * page 3 * * Sections 2.2 and 2.4 * | [X] - MEDIATEK INC, "Enhancement on multi-beam operation", vol. RAN WG1, no. e-Meeting; 20210125 - 20210205, (20210119), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-2100588, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: https://ftp.3gpp.org/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_104-e/Docs/R1-2100588.zip R1-2100588_MB_final.docx, (20210119), XP051971059 [X] 12-30 * Sections 2.3.1, 2.3.3, 2.3.4, 2.4.2.2.5 * * figures 8, 5, 11 * * table 3 * | [XA] - SAMSUNG, "Multi-beam enhancements", vol. RAN WG1, no. e-Meeting; 20210125 - 20210205, (20210118), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-2101186, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: https://ftp.3gpp.org/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_104-e/Docs/R1-2101186.zip R1-2101186 Multi-beam enhacements Final.docx, (20210118), XP051971402 [X] 12-18,25-30 * table 1 * [A] 19-24 |