EP4333733 - STRAIGHT AND CURVED FEMORAL BROACH IMPACTOR ADAPTERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.02.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.11.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 17.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | 12.07.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DePuy Synthes Products, Inc. 325 Paramount Drive Raynham, MA 02767 / US | [2024/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LASHURE, Daniel E. Raynham, Massachusetts 02767 / US | 02 /
REEDER, Nathan C. Raynham, Massachusetts 02767 / US | 03 /
ISAZA, Humberto Raynham, Massachusetts 02767 / US | 04 /
SHULAW, Cory A. Raynham, Massachusetts 02767 / US | [2024/11] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [2024/11] | Application number, filing date | 22721866.6 | 26.04.2022 | [2024/11] | WO2022IB53871 | Priority number, date | US202117314409 | 07.05.2021 Original published format: US202117314409 | [2024/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022234397 | Date: | 10.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4333733 | Date: | 13.03.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.11.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/16 | [2024/11] | CPC: |
A61B17/1668 (EP,US);
A61B17/921 (EP,US);
A61B17/164 (US);
A61B17/92 (EP);
A61B17/1659 (EP);
A61B2017/00367 (US);
A61B2017/00477 (EP);
A61B2017/00486 (US);
A61B2017/564 (US);
A61B2017/925 (US);
A61F2/4607 (EP);
A61F2002/30471 (EP);
A61F2002/30505 (EP);
A61F2002/30566 (EP);
A61F2002/30571 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/11] | Title | German: | GERADE UND GEKRÜMMTE FEMORALE RÄUMWERKZEUG-IMPAKTORADAPTER | [2024/11] | English: | STRAIGHT AND CURVED FEMORAL BROACH IMPACTOR ADAPTERS | [2024/11] | French: | ADAPTATEURS D'IMPACTEUR DE BROCHE FÉMORALE DROITE ET INCURVÉE | [2024/11] | Entry into regional phase | 24.10.2023 | National basic fee paid | 24.10.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.10.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.10.2023 | Examination requested [2024/11] | 24.10.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]DE202006012836U (BIOMET DEUTSCHLAND GMBH [DE]) [Y] 4-6 * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0074] * * figures 1-7 *; | [XY]DE202008017199U (AESCULAP AG [DE]) [X] 1-3,7-12,19,20 * paragraph [0084] - paragraph [0116] * * figures 1-8 * [Y] 4-6; | [A]US2014121650 (THOMSEN DARREN [US], et al) [A] 1,19 * paragraph [0074] - paragraph [0081] ** figures 1-3C *; | [A]EP2777551 (DEPUY IRELAND [IE]) [A] 1,19 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0046] * * figures 1-4 * |